COPPA-KNUDSON v. TANNER, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-05016 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
TANNER, LLC
36 SOUTH STATE STREET SUITE 600
SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/07 1:46 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Dismissal (case)
Tue 04/05 11:39 AM
Notice of Dismissal with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Response
Wed 03/23 3:36 PM
Response with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf
Thu 03/10 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
orderad
Show Cause for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution
Tue 03/08 3:01 PM
Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution. Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/5/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
court
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/20 11:10 PM
|
||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Off Calendar (Adv)
Mon 02/11 10:17 AM
Hearing Off Calendar (ias) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 11/26 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 (cly) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Tue 10/16 10:51 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 11/14/2018 at 02:00 PM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
9 | 9
adv_misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/16 8:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Hearing (Adv)
Mon 10/15 2:34 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 11/14/2018 Hearing Time: 2:00 p.m. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 10/15 1:53 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 2:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on TANNER, LLC 10/4/2018 Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/04 11:40 AM
Summons Issued on TANNER, LLC (lms) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 10/04 11:40 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (lms) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 10/03 3:37 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: TANNER, LLC. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Wed 10/03 3:21 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 18-05016 btb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18465880, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/03 3:20 PM
Adversary case 18-05016 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Filed by JERI COPPA-KNUDSON vs. TANNER, LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference, 13 Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer )(HARTMAN, JEFFREY) Modified on 10/4/2018 to reflect corrected relief (Gallagher, DA). |