ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch v. Doshi et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-09128 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2019 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Shiraj Deshpande
|
|
Defendant
Apoorva Doshi
|
|
Defendant
Vishal Doshi
|
|
Defendant
Alpesh Panchal
|
|
Defendant
Gurudas Patwardhan
|
|
Defendant
Shrikrishna Sant
|
|
Defendant
Atit Shah
45 River Drive S. #2005
Jersey City, NJ 07310 |
|
Defendant
Hiren Shah
|
|
Defendant
Sanjay Shah
|
|
Defendant
Nihar Parikh
|
|
Plaintiff
ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch
500 Fifth Avebue 28th Floor
New York, NY 10110 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wanlu Zeng
Terminated: 03/29/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Thu 12/26 12:10 PM
Mailed a copy of61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed to Atit Shah 45 River Drive S. #2005 Jersey City, NJ 07310 and Apoorva Doshi Quinten Matsijslei 8, Bus 8 Antwerpen 2018 Belgium. (nb) |
||
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
61 | 61
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs, ICICI BANK LIMITED, NEW YORK BRANCH, and ICICI BANK UK PLC, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, as to all of the defendants. The Clerk is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Notice to pro se Defendants Atit Shah and Apoorva Doshi. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/23/2019) (ks) |
|
60 | 60
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Shiraj Deshpande, Shriraj Deshpande, Ami Doshi, Apoorva Doshi, Geeta Doshi, Rachna Doshi, Shreyas Doshi, Vishal Doshi, Genashi Gems Private Limited, Alpesh Panchal, Nihar Parikh, Gurudas Patwardhan, Shrikrishna Sant, Atit Shah, Darshan Banuchandra Shah, Hiren Shah, Sanjay Shah, Trezza Jewels LLP, Wanlu Zeng. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch, ICICI Bank UK PLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Finkel, Adam) |
|
59 | 59
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Adam Finkel dated December 23, 2019 re: Response to Order dated December 19, 2019. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch, ICICI Bank UK PLC.(Finkel, Adam) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/23 10:48 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 60 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Vernon S. Broderick for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (km) |
||
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 12/20 10:27 AM
Mailed a copy of58 Order, to Apoorva Doshi, at Quinten Matijslei 8, Bus 8, 2018 Antwerpen, Belgium. (aea) |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
58 | 58
![]() ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that if the original complaint was served on Defendant Doshi and/or any other Defendants, Plaintiffs shall file (1) proof of service of the initial complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(l)(1), and (2) a letter setting forth its argument why the amended complaint should not be stricken for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 15. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the original complaint was not served on Defendant Doshi and/or any other Defendants, Plaintiffs shall submit a letter setting forth its argument why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute as against those Defendants who have not been served. In either case, Plaintiff's update letter shall be submitted on or before January 3, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Doshi's request for an extension is held in abeyance at this time. To the extent the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure impose a valid deadline on Defendant Doshi to respond to the initial complaint or the amended complaint, such deadline is held in abeyance pending further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Doshi is directed to provide the court with an address at which he can receive mail. He is advised that prior orders sent to the return address listed on the docket and on his most recent communication have been repeatedly returned as undeliverable. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to pro se Defendant Apoorva Doshi, at Quinten Matijslei 8, Bus 8, 2018 Antwerpen, Belgium. As a courtesy, Chambers shall e-mail a copy of this Order to Defendant Apoorva Doshi at apoorvadoshi@gmail.com. However, Defendant is advised that to the extent he is a valid defendant, it is his obligation to provide the Court with a valid mailing address. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/19/2019) (jca) |