AUGE v. GULF COAST HEALTH CARE INC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger Vinson |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02146 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2003 Job Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2019 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
GULF COAST HEALTH CARE INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOMARRA AUGE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/06 4:19 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 15 MEDIATION REPORT. This cause is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice and without taxation of costs. In the event settlement is not consummated for any reason, the Court reserves the power, upon motion filed by any party within 60 days after date, to amend, alter or vacate and set aside this order of dismissal. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/6/2020. (MB) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 01/02 2:14 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:15 MEDIATION resulted in Settlement. (MB) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
Wed 07/10 8:59 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling MEDIATION REPORT by JOMARRA AUGE (CONNORS, CLAYTON) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/18 11:32 AM
ORDER. The motion for extension (ECF No. 13 ) is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended by forty-five (45) days, to 6/13/2019 , and all other affected deadlines, including the dispositive motion deadline, are also extended by forty-five (45) days. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/18/2019. (sdw) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 04/18 7:45 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 04/17 5:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOMARRA AUGE. (CONNORS, CLAYTON) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 03/19 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR SUBPOENAS FOR DEPOSITION by JOMARRA AUGE (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/04 4:03 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER Re: 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. All Discovery must be completed by 4/29/2019 . The pretrial conference will be scheduled by the Court after ruling on any pending dispositive motions and the trial date will be determined at the pretrial conference. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 2/4/2019. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 01/30 7:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB) |
||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 01/29 2:03 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 01/18 11:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:8 Initial Scheduling Order, (Rule 26 Meeting Report no filed) (djb) |
||
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 01/14 3:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GULF COAST HEALTH CARE INC. (LEVITT, MARK) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/03 4:19 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/17/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2019 . Discovery due by 4/29/2019 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/3/2018. (sdw) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 12/03 3:03 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:7 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/30 9:39 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by GULF COAST HEALTH CARE INC. (LEVITT, MARK) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/15 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOMARRA AUGE. GULF COAST HEALTH CARE INC served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/09 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Gulf Coast Health Care Inc., d/b/a Specialty Health & Rehabilitation Center. (MB) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 10/09 8:23 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectlyand will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps andwithout punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure foradding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/orchapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available atwww.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 10/05 11:30 AM
NOTICE summons by Jomarra Auge (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/05 11:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/05 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Gulf Coast Health Care Inc., d/b/a Specialty Health & Rehabilitation Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4305504.), filed by Jomarra Auge. (WESTBERRY, RICHARD) |