Tightlines UV Technology LLC v. Pure Fishing Inc
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Sherri A Lydon |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02709 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2019 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Pure Fishing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tightlines UV Technology LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 01/13 4:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Joint by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Tue 01/07 11:56 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Chief Judge Terry L Wooten no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 12/04 11:53 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Mediation Deadlines. The new deadline to complete fact discovery and file motions to compel discovery is February 24, 2020. The new deadline to complete mediation is March 13, 2020. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 4, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 12/02 10:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until November 27, 2019 to respond to Defendants Motions to Compel. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on December 2, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/27 2:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Response filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 9.16.19 Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 11.26.19 Email Chain, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2nd Supp Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFP No. 1-53, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 54-57 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/27 2:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re36 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Response filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 9.16.19 Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 11.26.19 Email Chain, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 1-53, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2nd Supp. Rsps and Objs to Def First Set of RFPs No. 54-57 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 11/27 12:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery and Mediation Deadlines by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 11/21 4:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motions to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 35,36) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Sealed Motion
Mon 11/11 5:46 PM
SEALED MOTION by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard | ||
35 | 35
motion
Sealed Motion
Mon 11/11 5:36 PM
SEALED MOTION by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard | ||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
misc
Entry Deletion
Fri 11/01 3:20 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 34-37 Reason: documents were filed prematurely. The filings may be re-filed after the district judge has ruled on the motion to seal. (kbos) |
||
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Declaration
Thu 10/31 10:05 PM
DECLARATION by Pure Fishing Incre36 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents .(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document : Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard | ||
36 | 36
motion
Compel
Thu 10/31 9:42 PM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Declaration
Thu 10/31 9:39 PM
DECLARATION by Pure Fishing Incre34 MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatories .(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document : Declaration of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Robert J. Leonard | ||
34 | 34
motion
Compel
Thu 10/31 9:13 PM
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Seal, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on November 8, 2019.(kbos) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Seal
Thu 10/31 9:09 PM
MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Defendant's Motions to Compel and Certain Exhibits to the Declarations of Robert J. Leonard in Support of Defendant's Motions to Compel by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
32 | 32
respoth
Claim Construction Brief
Thu 10/31 6:44 PM
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '728 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Allbaits Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dictionary Def of "peak", | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Prosecution history, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Color Vision Chap 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Principles of Instrumental Analysis, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Limit of Blank article, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Limits of Detection in Spectroscopy article, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Protocols for Determination of Limits, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Decl. of Iezzi | ||
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
respoth
Claim Construction Brief
Mon 10/21 4:54 PM
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '728 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Allbait claim construction order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dictionary definition of "peak" | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 10/03 11:21 AM
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on October 2, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/01 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 09/19 3:19 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing. The new deadline for parties to exchange opening claim construction briefs and submit technical tutorials is October 3, 2019. The new deadline for parties to exchange rebuttal claim construction briefs is October 14, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on September 19, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 09/16 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Briefing by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/07 10:07 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2020, Mediation Due by 1/15/2020, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on August 6, 2019. (kbos) |
|
25 | 25
11
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/07 10:03 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on August 6, 2019. (kbos) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Joint Claim Construction Statement
Thu 07/25 4:28 PM
JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. (Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Confidentiality Order
Thu 07/18 10:04 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on July 17, 2019. (kbos) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Confidentiality Order
Fri 06/28 11:10 AM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Redline of Proposed Order and Standard Order | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 9:21 AM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Jacqueline Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 9:20 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Robert Leonard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 9:18 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for John Harbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on April 9, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Wed 04/03 12:27 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline K. Burt ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8364163) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 03/22 4:50 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Leonard ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8342826) by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Robert J. Leonard and Certificate of Good Standing | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 03/22 4:36 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Harbin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8342809) by Pure Fishing Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of John W. Harbin and Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Wed 03/20 3:30 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 03/20 3:21 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/15 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion for Travis Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on March 15, 2019.(kbos) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Tue 02/26 2:39 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Travis Edwards Lynch ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8290694) by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit and Application of Travis Edwards Lynch | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/14 1:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/6/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/20/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/20/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/6/2019, Discovery due by 10/23/2019, Motions due by 11/7/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/6/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/6/2020, Mediation Due by 12/6/2019, Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on February 14, 2019. (kbos) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 02/13 5:05 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pure Fishing Inc.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/13 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Pure Fishing Inc.(McWilliams, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter Extending Time to Answer
Fri 01/11 11:16 AM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Pure Fishing Inc answer due 2/13/2019. (Nickles, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Thu 01/03 11:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Pure Fishing Inc served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Nickles, Matthew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/3/2019 with corrected pdf) (kbos) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark
Fri 10/05 3:36 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (kbos) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 10/05 3:35 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tightlines UV Technology LLC.(kbos) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/05 3:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Pure Fishing Inc. (kbos) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/05 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Pure Fishing Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8038237.), filed by Tightlines UV Technology LLC. Service due by 1/2/2019(kbos) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, US Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Analysis of Berkeley Flatnose Minnow, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Spectral Analysis Report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, Berkeley Website Maxscent Flatnose Minnow, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Berkeley Website Maxscent the General, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Tacklewarehouse website, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Walmart website |