U.S. Pastor Council et al v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00824 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2019 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Charlotte A. Burrows
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chai R. Feldblum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Victoria A. Lipnic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William P Barr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hotze Health & Wellness Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Pastor Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Braidwood Management Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jefferson B Sessions, III
Terminated: 02/14/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Texas evangelical groups are suing for the right to discriminate against LGBTQ workers (vox.com) |
Submitted Fri 10/12/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
164 | 164
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 04/22 8:46 AM
ORDER: The Court DENIES as moot Plaintiffs' Application for Costs and Attorneys' Fees (ECF No.153 ). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/22/2024) (saw) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
163 | 163
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Payment of Costs and Fees Award filed by Bear Creek Bible Church, Braidwood Management Inc (Mitchell, Jonathan) |