Westmoreland Kemmerer Fee Coal Holdings, LLC Jointly Administered under 18-35672.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-35672
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-35672
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-35695 |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Westmoreland Kemmerer Fee Coal Holdings, LLC
9540 Maroon Cir Ste 300
Englewood, CO 80112-5730 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago |
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
trustee
Remark (batch)
Mon 10/16 4:21 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Lopez . (RobbieWestmoreland) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 10/13 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 10/13 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Wed 10/10 6:00 AM
|
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/10 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran Jr (Duran, Hector) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Wed 10/10 3:27 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) Filed. (jdav) |
|
2 | 2
order
Joint Administration
Tue 10/09 5:41 PM
Order for Joint Administration Signed on 10/9/2018 (aaloadi) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 10/09 8:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Westmoreland Kemmerer Coal Holdings, LLC. (Peguero, Kristhy) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 10/09 9:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-35695 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20484360. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 10/09 3:39 PM
Judge David R Jones added to case (aalo) |
||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Tue 10/09 5:41 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 18-3567218-35672 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) |