Alaska District Court
Judge:Ralph R Beistline
Case #: 3:12-cv-00048
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2012
Re-opened:Dec 05, 2014
Terminated:Dec 12, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2015 5:35 AM AKDT
Defendant
Northern Alaska Environmental Center
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
James Watson
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of the Interior
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Defendant
The Wilderness Society
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Sierra Club
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
George Eric Hays
Law Office Of George Hays
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Redoil, Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Pacific Environment and Resources Center
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Ocean Conservancy Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
National Audubon Society, Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Mark Fesmire
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Defendant
Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Defendant
Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Sally Jewell
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Plaintiff
Oceana
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Pacific Environment
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
National Audubon Society
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ocean Conservancy
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Resisting Environmental Destruction on Indigenous Lands (REDOIL)
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shell Gulf of Mexico Inc.
Represented By
David J. Mayberry
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Parker
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sierra Club
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Plaintiff
Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Eric P. Jorgensen
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kenneth L. Salazar
Terminated: 04/10/2013
Represented By
Bridget K. McNeil
contact info
Kent E. Hanson
contact info
David B. Glazer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Defendant
Oceana Inc.
Terminated: 11/25/2014
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Defendant
Defenders of Wildlife
Terminated: 10/04/2012
Represented By
Justina Sessions
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Holly Anne Harris
Earthjustice (juneau)
contact info
Rachael E. Meny
Keker & Van Nest
contact info
Timothy W. Seaver
Seaver & Wagner, LLC
contact info
Shilpi Agarwal
Keker & Van Nest
contact info



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.