Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Referred: Prisoner Pro Se
Case #: 2:18-cv-04212
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2018
Terminated:Dec 14, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
misc Receipt Tue 06/29 4:20 PM
RECEIPT number T21160 in the amount of $13.66 issued to DOC on behalf of BROWN, TIMOTHY. (ADIClerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
misc Receipt Mon 06/07 1:46 PM
RECEIPT number T21138 in the amount of $112.44 issued to DOC on behalf of BROWN, TIMOTHY. (ADIClerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
misc Receipt Tue 09/01 1:40 PM
RECEIPT number T20232 in the amount of $15.62 issued to DOC on behalf of BROWN, TIMOTHY. (ADIClerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
misc Receipt Wed 08/14 3:52 PM
RECEIPT number T19226 in the amount of $67.47 issued to DOC on behalf of BROWN, TIMOTHY. (James, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
misc Receipt Fri 07/12 1:52 PM
RECEIPT number T19191 in the amount of $19.38 issued to DOC on behalf of TIMOTHY BROWN.(Wang, Zan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
misc Receipt Wed 06/19 10:40 AM
RECEIPT number T19169 in the amount of $30.31 issued to MO DOC for Timothy Brown. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
misc Receipt Thu 04/18 9:39 AM
RECEIPT number T19105 in the amount of $17.75 issued to MO DOC for Timothy Brown. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
misc Receipt Tue 03/19 3:55 PM
RECEIPT number T1978 in the amount of $15.62 issued to DOC for Timothy Brown. (Russel, Jeri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
misc Receipt Wed 02/20 3:56 PM
RECEIPT number T1950 in the amount of $18.80 issued to DOC for Timothy Brown. (Geiser, Angel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
7 7 order Clerk's Judgment Fri 12/14 8:25 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is summarily dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. It is also ORDERED that the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350 filing fee is paid. (Richard, Tracey)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Fri 12/14 8:23 AM
ORDER: ORDERED that this case is summarily dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. It is also ORDERED that the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350 filing fee is paid. Signed on December 14, 2018 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
misc Receipt Fri 10/19 3:26 PM
RECEIPT number KCMO073627 in the amount of $18.18 issued to Timothy Brown. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/10 11:58 AM
ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $18.18; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before October 24, 2018, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on October 10, 2018 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Davies, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
3 3 misc Inmate Account Statement Wed 10/10 11:23 AM
Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Timothy Brown. (Davies, Cindy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Affidavit Wed 10/10 11:22 AM
IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Timothy Brown. (Davies, Cindy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/10 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Corizon Health Services filed by Timothy Brown. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)
Related: [-]