BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC et al v. EXCO Operating Company, LP et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-03290 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raider Marketing, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raider Marketing GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Services, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Resources (XA), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Partners GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Land Company, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Holding MLP, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Holding (PA), Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO GP Partners Old, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Resources, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXCO Operating Company, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP
Thompson & Knight LLP 811 Main St., Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC
Thompson & Knight LLP 811 Main St., Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/08 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 11/07/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 11/05 2:15 PM
Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Settlement By and Among the Debtors, BHP KCS, BHP Properties, BHP Petroleum, Petrohawk, and Winwell, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3290 Signed on 11/5/2018 (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate
Fri 10/19 10:28 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP ) (Hancock, Tye) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Fri 10/19 11:00 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:15 a.m. Appearances: : T. Hancock for Plaintiff BHP & A.Rotman for Debtors. Telephone Appearance: A. Schwarzman for Debtors. . Parties provided the Court a status update regarding their resolution. As stated on the record, if parties reach a deal they are to notice a hearing for 11/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. if they do not reach a deal the discovery dispute will be scheduled for 10/25/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are to contact Case Manager Ms. Do regarding the scheduling of these possible hearings. (JesusGuajardo) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Wed 10/17 9:41 AM
Notice of Status Conference . Filed by BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP (Hancock, Tye) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Tue 10/16 4:20 PM
Status Conference Set On Status conference to be held on 10/19/2018 at 10:15 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 10/15 4:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on EXCO GP Partners Old, LP 10/12/2018; EXCO Holding (PA), Inc. 10/12/2018; EXCO Holding MLP, Inc. 10/12/2018; EXCO Land Company, LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Operating Company, LP 10/12/2018; EXCO Partners GP, LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Resources (XA), LLC 10/12/2018; EXCO Resources, Inc. 10/12/2018; EXCO Services, Inc. 10/12/2018; Raider Marketing GP, LLC 10/12/2018; Raider Marketing, LP 10/12/2018. (Hancock, Tye) |
|
Sunday, October 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 10/14 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 10/14/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Setting Hearing
Fri 10/12 4:49 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 10/12/2018. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (rcas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate
Fri 10/12 9:53 AM
Certificate of Service (Supplemental) (Filed By BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP ) (Hancock, Tye) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 10/12 9:23 AM
Summons Issued on EXCO GP Partners Old, LP Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Holding (PA), Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Holding MLP, Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Land Company, LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Operating Company, LP Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Partners GP, LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Resources (XA), LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Resources, Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2018; EXCO Services, Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2018; Raider Marketing GP, LLC Date Issued 10/12/2018; Raider Marketing, LP Date Issued 10/12/2018. (DesireeSillas) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice
Thu 10/11 5:29 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP (Hancock, Tye) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 10/10 7:54 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, and Raider Marketing, LP. (Hancock, Tye) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 10/10 7:17 PM
Adversary case 18-03290 Nature of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by BHP Billiton Petroleum (KCS Resources), LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), LP against EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP. Fee Amount $350 (Hancock, Tye) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D |