New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alison J Nathan
Case #: 1:18-cv-09311
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2018
Terminated:Dec 06, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2019 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
National Public Radio, Inc.
Plaintiff
Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, January 18, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/18 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) National Public Radio, Inc.. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/07 6:25 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to reopen this action is hereby extended by fifteen (15) days. All litigation deadlines shall remain discontinued. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/7/2019) (cf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
11 11 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/04 6:52 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Wendy C. Butler dated January 4, 2019 re:10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reopen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from C.K. Lee, Esq. dated January 4, 2019. . Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc.. (Butler, Wendy)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/04 5:44 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reopen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from C.K. Lee, Esq. dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Thu 12/06 1:28 PM
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, see Dkt. No. 8, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. All scheduled conferences are hereby adjourned. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/5/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
8 8 motion Stay Mon 12/03 5:56 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from C.K. Lee, Esq. dated December 3, 2018. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/29 6:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/05 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Public Radio, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 10/18 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, February 22th, 2019 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2018) (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 10/12 12:49 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Public Radio, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 10/12 12:44 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 10/12 12:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 10/12 12:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/11 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 10/11 4:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Public Radio, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/11 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against National Public Radio, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15730323)Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]