New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jerome B Simandle
Referred: Karen M Williams
Case #: 1:18-cv-14847
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2018
Terminated:May 20, 2019
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2019 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
AT&T INC.
Represented By
STEPHEN R. KNOX
Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY
pro se 2834 ATLANTIC AVE, 815
ATLANTIC CITY, NJ 08401


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 20, 2019
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Mon 05/20 2:14 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/20/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/20 2:20 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
20 20 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/20 11:08 AM
ORDER directing Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's letter on or before 5/24/2019 confirming whether a settlement has been reached and setting forth Defendant's position on Plaintiff's requested extension of time to file a Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/17/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/17 1:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by AT&T INC.. (KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/17 9:41 AM
ORDER Granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kyle Steinmetz, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/16/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
17 17 misc Letter Fri 05/03 11:09 AM
Letter from WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY dated 4/29/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/22 11:20 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by AT&T INC. re14 MOTION to Amend/Correct(KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Andrew Schuddeboom
Monday, April 08, 2019
15 15 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
Notice of Addendum to14 Motion to Amend Complaint by WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/28 3:35 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY.(dmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/28 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/25 1:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AT&T INC. re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration (KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kyle Steinmetz
Monday, March 18, 2019
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/18 2:25 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration(rss, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/19 11:18 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's letter request for an extension to respond to Defendant's Motion. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/19/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
10 10 misc Letter Fri 02/15 12:49 PM
Letter from WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY requesting extension of time to respond to Defendant's Motion. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/04 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kyle Steinmetz, Esq. by AT&T INC..(KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Stephen Knox, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of Kyle Steinmetz, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/04 3:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kyle Steinmetz, Esq. . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/25 2:45 PM
ORDER Granting letter request to adjourn the return date of the Motion to Dismiss to 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 1/25/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Fri 01/25 11:48 AM
Letter from Stephen Knox re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration . (KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/25 2:46 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/17 2:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T INC.. (KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 01/17 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration by AT&T INC.. Responses due by 2/19/2019(KNOX, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gary Long,
Att: 3 Declaration of Kyle Steinmetz,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to K. Steinmetz Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to K. Steinmetz Decl.,
Att: 6 Declaration of Andrew Schuddeboom,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4 to to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5 to to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 13 Exhibit 7 to to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 15 Exhibit 9 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 16 Exhibit 10 to A. Schuddeboom Decl.,
Att: 17 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/17 3:31 PM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/09 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY. AT&T INC. served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (cry, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
3 3 misc Letter: re USM 285 Mon 10/22 9:17 AM
CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (rss, )
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/22 9:15 AM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the complaint etc.. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/19/2018. (rss, n.m.)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Mon 10/22 9:16 AM
COMPLAINT against AT&T INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM HENRY KENNEDY. See1 for documents(rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
1 1 service Complaint Received Thu 10/11 11:41 AM
Complaint Received.(cry, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet