Matterport Inc. v. GeoCV, Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01569 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2019 6:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
GeoCV, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matterport Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
98 | 98
2
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Thu 10/22 2:42 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,861,840 B2; 9,165,410 B1; 9,171,405 B1; 8,879,828 B2; 9,953,111 B2; 10,030,979 B2.(nms) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Order and Final Judgment | ||
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
97 | 97
3
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 10/21 2:06 PM
ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment, Entering Final Judgment, and Granting Permanent Injunction (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2020. (nms) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
96 | 96
8
pgs
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 10/20 12:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Summary Judgment and for a Permanent Injunction - filed by Matterport Inc..(Cucuzzella, Lucinda) Modified on 10/20/2020 (nms). |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order | ||
95 | 95
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/20 10:53 AM
SO ORDERED Granting93 Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2020. (nms) |
|
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 10/20 1:31 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Heafey for Matterport Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
94 | 94
3
pgs
misc
Declaration
Mon 10/19 8:00 PM
DECLARATION of Michael F. Heafey re93 Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment, by Matterport Inc..(Cucuzzella, Lucinda) Modified on 10/20/2020 (nms). |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit B | ||
93 | 93
7
pgs
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 10/19 7:58 PM
Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by Matterport Inc.. (Cucuzzella, Lucinda) Modified on 10/20/2020 (nms). |
|
92 | 92
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/19 2:56 PM
SO ORDERED Granting91 Joint Stipulation Regarding Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/19/2020. (nms) |
|
91 | 91
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Mon 10/19 1:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION Regarding Settlement by Matterport Inc.. (Cucuzzella, Lucinda) |