Bay Club Partners-472, LLC
Oregon Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Randall L Dunn |
Case #: | 3:14-bk-30394 |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 04, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 02, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2015 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 10, 2014 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bay Club Partners-472, LLC
3827 SW Hall Blvd
Beaverton, OR 97005-2049 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
620 SW Main St #213
Portland, OR 97205 |
![]() Memoandum Opinion Re: 59 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Creditor Legg Mason Real Estate CDO I, Ltd. and 62 Motion to Join/for Joinder of Trail Ranch Partners, LLC (dda) |
1. | Wave Goodbye to Bankruptcy Waivers? (Court Rules LLC?s Prepetition Waiver of Bankruptcy Protection Contrary to Public Policy) (business-finance-restructuring.weil.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/02/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
473 | 473
![]() Final Order By District Court Judge Michael W Mosman, Appeal on Civil Action Number: 3:15-cv-01977-MO, Stipulated Dismissal of Appeal by Parties Re:439 Notice of Appeal #2. (pjk) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
472 | 472
![]() First Amended Certificate of Service471 Correspondence Filed By Stockholder Trail Ranch Partners, LLC (BULLOCK, GARY) |