Petty v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-09524 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1333 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2019 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
BP America Production Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Louise Petty
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Receipt
Wed 04/03 1:00 PM
Receipt of Transfer Case to Southern District of Mississippi. (mm) |
|
15 | 15
order
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 04/02 12:34 PM
Case transferred to District of Southern District of Mississippi: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/2/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Statement
Fri 03/29 3:49 PM
Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Transcript
Tue 03/26 2:53 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on Febrauary 27, 2019 before Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (rsg) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 03/01 10:14 AM
ORDER re5 Motion to Compel: Oral argument was conducted in the matters listed below on February 27, 2019, regarding defendants' 148 motions to compel disclosures from plaintiffs. At the hearing, counsel agreed that disclosure requirements have been satisfied in the following cases. Accordingly, defendants' motions to compel in the following cases are dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019. (mmv) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/28 1:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2019 re5 Defendants' 148 Motions to Compel Disclosures. SUBMITTED. A separate order consistent with the oral rulings at the hearing will be issued. (mmv) |
|
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 02/18 1:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Jennifer Louise Petty re5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing . (Nations, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Thu 02/14 9:07 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for defendant's5 motions to compel currently set for submission on February 20, 2019, is hereby CONTINUED to February 27, 2019, and oral argument on all of these motions will be conducted on FEBRUARY 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for all affected plaintiffs and defendant must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2019.(mmv) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Mon 02/11 7:43 PM
Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/11 5:02 PM
STIPULATION by Jennifer Louise Petty /Plaintiff's Statement of Facts (Nations, Howard) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Request/Statement of Oral Argument
Mon 02/11 8:12 AM
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. regarding5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing (Haycraft, Don) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Compel
Mon 02/11 8:11 AM
MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2019.(Haycraft, Don) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/13 7:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/16 2:32 PM
INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015.(cg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 BELO Settlement Agreement | ||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 10/15 8:34 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) |
|
Sunday, October 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 10/14 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7170396) filed by Jennifer Louise Petty.Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Jennifer Louise Petty(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |