New York Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Carl L Bucki
Case #: 1:18-bk-12156
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Jan 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tonawanda Coke Corporation
PO Box 5007
Tonawanda, NY 14151-5007
Represented By
Garry M. Graber
Hodgson, Russ
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Joseph W. Allen
Office of the U.S. Trustee Olympic Towers 300 Pearl Street, Suite 401
Buffalo, NY 14202

GPO Aug 27 2024
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 8/27/2024 (RE: related document(s)790 Decision and Order). (Leidolph, J.)

1. Tonawanda Coke files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (wivb.com)
Submitted Wed 10/17/2018
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
921 921 order Compensation Mon 05/12 2:46 PM
Order Granting First and Final Application for Allowance of Compensation to Baumeister Denz LLP for Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. fees awarded: $104,812.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Related [+]. Signed on 5/12/2025. NOTICE OF ENTRY. Modified on 5/12/2025 (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-] related doc(s)916 Application for Compensation
920 920 court Hearing Held (CDI) Mon 05/12 11:54 AM
Hearing Held - Approved. Appearances: A. Baumeister, J. Thoman, J. Zubler Related [+]. (Gentz, M.)
Related: [-] related document(s)916 Application for Compensation
Friday, May 09, 2025
919 919 misc Ch. 11 Ballot Fri 05/09 1:04 PM
Chapter 11 Ballot Filed by Steel City Salt, LLC (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]