Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:18-cv-13257
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2018
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2019 4:24 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Joseph Labib
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Renee Labib
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Max Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Maximum Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Thomas W. Cranmer
Miller Canfield Paddock And Stone PLC
contact info
Ross O. Silverman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
David D. O'Brien
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
John W. Reale
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Michael J. Powers
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Labib
28051 Dequindre Road, Suite A
Madison Heights, MI 48071
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Renee Labib
5445 Oakman Boulevard
Dearborn, MI 48126
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Max Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC
28051 Dequindre Road, Suite A
Madison Heights, MI 48071
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Maximum Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC
5445 Oakman Boulevard
Dearborn, MI 48126
Represented By
Steven Haney
Haney Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, IL
Represented By
Thomas W. Cranmer
Miller Canfield Paddock And Stone PLC
contact info
Ross O. Silverman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
David D. O'Brien
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
John W. Reale
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Michael J. Powers
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, July 08, 2019
28 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Allen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs STIPULATED ORDER Allowing Attorney David D. O'Brien to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (MacKay, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
26 26 9 pgs REPLY to Response re24 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaim Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
25 25 25 pgs RESPONSE to24 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaim Complaint filed by Joseph Labib, Renee Labib, Max Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC, Maximum Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC. (Haney, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
24 24 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaim Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
23 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for State Farm Mutual to File an Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims ( Answer Due by 3/18/19 ). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
22 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for State Farm Mutual to File an Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims ( Answer due by 2/15/2019 ). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
21 21 COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs (Haney, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit
20 20 ORDER Directing Clerk to Strike19 Counterclaim, and Remove Image. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
19 19 [STRICKEN] COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs (Haney, Steven) Modified on 12/13/2018 (RLou).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit
18 18 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Haney, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
17 17 Order Vacating13 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
16 16 STIPULATED ORDER Allowing Defendants a Thirty (30) Day Extension to File Answer to Complaint ( Responsive Pleading due by 12/14/2018 ). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
15 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, November 19, 2018
14 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven Haney appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Haney, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/26/2018 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
12 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Renee Labib served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (O'Brien, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Maximum Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (O'Brien, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Max Rehab Physical Therapy, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (O'Brien, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joseph Labib served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (O'Brien, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
8 8 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (EKar)
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (EKar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 10/17 7:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Powers on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Powers, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 10/17 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Reale on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 10/17 7:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ross O. Silverman on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Silverman, Ross)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 10/17 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David D. O'Brien on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Brien, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance Wed 10/17 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cranmer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 10/17 5:16 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 10/17 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6951549 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: McLean - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] Related [+]
Related: [-] ale, John
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Treatment Appx,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Maximum Rehab LARA Filings,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Sample Two-Page Initial Evals,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Sample Narrative Initial Evals,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Two-Page Initial Eval Appx,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Sample Two-Page Initial Evals,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Narrative Initial Eval Appendix,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Patient C.D. Initial Evals,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Sample Plans of Care,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Plan of Care Appendix,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Sample Daily Treatment Notes,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Sample Treatment Flow Sheet,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Sample Treatment Flow Sheet,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - M.K. Two-Page Initial Eval,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - M.K. Transcript,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - B.D. Two-Page Initial Eval,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - B.D. Transcript,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Daily Treatment Notes,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - R.K. and T.K. Two-Page Initial Evals,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - E.B. and H.K. Two-Page Initial Evals,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Sample PT Rxs,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Sample Progress Reports,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 - Final Daily Treatment Notes for 6 Patients,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 - Discharge Summaries for 6 Patients,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 - Sample Bills