COPPA-KNUDSON v. FETCH, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-05018 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
FETCH, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/24 2:37 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
orderad
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Wed 07/29 12:45 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) (cly) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Fri 10/18 3:40 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 (lms) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Off Calendar (Adv)
Wed 10/16 11:07 AM
Hearing Off Calendar TRIAL re: (ias) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
adv_misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/17 2:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Thu 09/12 9:49 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Hearing (Adv)
Wed 09/11 2:47 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 10/16/2019 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Wed 09/11 2:44 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 and Settlement Agreement Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
orderad
Stipulated/Agreed Order
Fri 07/26 1:24 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order (cly) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
adv_misc
Stipulation
Thu 07/25 4:33 PM
Amended Stipulation By FETCH, LLC and Between Jerri Coppa-Knudson, Trustee with Certificate of Service Filed by TIMOTHY A LUKAS on behalf of FETCH, LLC (LUKAS, TIMOTHY) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
adv_misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/17 4:53 PM
Stipulation By FETCH, LLC and Between Jeri Coppa-Knudson, Trustee to Extend Deadlines with Certificate of Service Filed by TIMOTHY A LUKAS on behalf of FETCH, LLC (LUKAS, TIMOTHY) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
orderad
Scheduling Order (BNC)
Tue 07/09 3:31 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC) Settlement Conference scheduled for 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg. (cly) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Fri 05/10 2:34 PM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. Trial date set for 10/18/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
9 | 9
5
pgs
orderad
Order (generic)
Fri 05/10 2:33 PM
Order Regarding Pretrial and Trial Matters (cly) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
adv_misc
Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan
Tue 04/30 11:56 AM
Discovery Plan Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Fri 02/22 5:36 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 2/19/2019. Continued. Appearances: JEFFREY L HARTMAN, TIMOTHY A LUKAS Scheduling Conference scheduled for 04/30/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (ias) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/03 2:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by TIMOTHY A LUKAS on behalf of FETCH, LLC (LUKAS, TIMOTHY) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 10/19 10:42 AM
Summons Issued on FETCH, LLC (cly) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 10/19 10:41 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 10/18 3:19 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: FETCH, LLC. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 10/18 2:20 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 18-05018 btb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18494259, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/18 2:08 PM
Adversary case 18-05018 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Filed by JERI COPPA-KNUDSON vs. FETCH, LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |