Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ann M Nevins
Case #: 3:18-bk-31722
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Mar 07, 2019
Claims Deadline:Mar 27, 2019
Converted:Jan 16, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ServiCom LLC
25 Independence Blvd Ste 103
Warren, NJ 07059-2706
Represented By
Eric A. Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Patrick R. Linsey
Zeisler & Zeisler PC
contact info
James Berman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Stephen M. Kindseth
Zeisler & Zeisler
contact info
Debtor
JNET Communications LLC
25 Independence Blvd Ste 103
Warren, NJ 07059-2706
Represented By
Eric A. Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Patrick R. Linsey
Zeisler & Zeisler PC
contact info
James Berman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Stephen M. Kindseth
Zeisler & Zeisler
contact info
Debtor
Vitel Communications LLC
25 Independence Blvd Ste 103
Warren, NJ 07059-2706
Represented By
Eric A. Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Patrick R. Linsey
Zeisler & Zeisler PC
contact info
James Berman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Stephen M. Kindseth
Zeisler & Zeisler
contact info
Debtor
ServiCom Canada Limited
25 Independence Blvd Ste 103
Warren, NJ 07059-2706
Represented By
Eric A. Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Patrick R. Linsey
Zeisler & Zeisler PC
contact info
James Berman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Stephen M. Kindseth
Zeisler & Zeisler
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Robert M. Fleischer
Green & Sklarz LLC
contact info
Joanna M. Kornafel
Green & Sklarz, LLC
contact info
Lawrence S. Grossman
Green & Sklarz LLC
contact info
Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Green & Sklarz LLC
contact info
Trustee
Barbara H. Katz
57 Trumbull Street
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Robert M. Fleischer
Green & Sklarz LLC
contact info
Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Green & Sklarz LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Kari A. Mitchell
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Steven E. Mackey
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Kim L. McCabe
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Apr 27 2022
Memorandum of Decision and Order Denying Motion to Modify Protective Order. (RE: 1157, 1256, 1334, 1339). (qv)
GPO May 23 2022
Memorandum Of Decision And Order Denying Motion To Amend Complaint In 19-3006 And Adjusting Deadlines For Filing Of Dispositive Motions. (RE: 1366, 1389). (qv)
GPO Jan 27 2025
Memorandum of Decision and Order Granting Motions in Limine Regarding Evidence Proffered by Coral Capital Solutions LLC (RE: 1941 Motion for Protective Order filed by Trustee Barbara H. Katz, 1967 Motion In Limine filed by Trustee Barbara H. Katz, 1976 Motion In Limine filed by Creditor VFI KR SPE I, LLC, 1977 Sealed Document Filed filed by Creditor VFI KR SPE I, LLC, 1978 Motion In Limine filed by Trustee Barbara H. Katz, 1979 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental / Amended filed by Creditor CORAL CAPITAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, 1980 Motion to Seal filed by Creditor CORAL CAPITAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, 1981 Motion In Limine filed by Creditor CORAL CAPITAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, 1982 Motion In Limine filed by Interested Party David Jefferson, Interested Party Eugene Caldwell, 1983 Sealed Document Filed filed by Interested Party David Jefferson, Interested Party Eugene Caldwell). (nsm)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2019 7:38 AM EDT
Friday, October 19, 2018
crditcrd none Fri 10/19 12:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-31722 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee - $1717.00. Receipt number 8521384. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Entry Fri 10/19 2:49 PM
An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases listed below. The docket in case no. 18-31722 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. The following Chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: ServiCom LLC, Case No. 18-31722 JNET Communications LLC., Case No. 18-31723 and Vitel Communications LLC, Case No. 18-31724 (Rodriguez, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
1 1 246 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 10/19 12:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. Atty Disclosure Statement Re: 2016(b), Statement of Financial Affairs Summary of Assets and Liabilities Incomplete Filings due by 11/2/2018. Filed by ServiCom LLC. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Fri 10/19 1:01 PM
Motion for Joint Administration With 18-31723 and 18-31724 Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Employ Fri 10/19 1:07 PM
Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for Debtors Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 10/19 1:11 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by James Berman on behalf of ServiCom LLC Debtor, . (Berman, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 10/19 1:14 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of ServiCom LLC Debtor, . (Linsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion to Use... Fri 10/19 1:21 PM
Motion To Use and Maintain Their Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms, and to Maintain Their Existing Cash Management System Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Pay Pre-Petition Payroll Fri 10/19 1:25 PM
Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Fri 10/19 1:34 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information to November 19, 2018 Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Use Cash Collateral Fri 10/19 1:59 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor. (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
10 10 motion Expedite Hearing Fri 10/19 2:09 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of ServiCom LLC, Debtor Related [+] (Kindseth, Stephen)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 3 Application to Employ filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 6 Motion To Use filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 7 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 8 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 9 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 order Joint Administration Fri 10/19 2:19 PM
Order Pursuant To Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of Cases Related [+] . (Rodriguez, Gretchen)
Related: [-] 2
12 12 court Notice For Consolidated List of Creditors Fri 10/19 2:40 PM
Notice to Provide Supplemental List of Creditors. (Rodriguez, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 10/19 2:48 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Eric A. Henzy on behalf of JNET Communications LLC, ServiCom LLC, Vitel Communications LLC Debtors, . (Henzy, Eric)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Expedite Hearing Fri 10/19 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Hearing to be held on 10/24/2018 at 02:30 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 157 Church Street, 18th Floor Courtroom, New Haven, CT. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Gretchen)
Related: [-] 6 Motion To Use filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC,7 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC,8 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC,9 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC
15 15 order Amended Order Fri 10/19 4:52 PM
Amended Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Hearing to be held on 10/24/2018 at 02:30 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 157 Church Street, 18th Floor Courtroom, New Haven, CT. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Gretchen)
Related: [-] 6 Motion To Use filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 7 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 8 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC, 9 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ServiCom LLC