Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Case #: 1:18-cv-24351
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2018
Terminated:Jan 31, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2019 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Alpargatas USA, Inc.
Represented By
Richard E. Berman
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Anahit Tagvoryan
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Maria Kathleen Vigilante
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Harrison M. Brown
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Guarisma
Represented By
Keith James Keogh
Keogh Law, Ltd.
contact info
Scott David Owens
Scott D. Owens, P.A.
contact info
Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr.
Bret Lusskin, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/23 9:29 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case shall remain CLOSED and all pending deadlines are hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Wed 12/23 2:56 PM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per DE41 Order. (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
40 40 motion Dismiss Mon 11/23 3:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss33 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Without Prejudice by Carlos Guarisma, Lani Woods, Lori Zaragoza. Responses due by 12/7/2020 (Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 09/21 2:40 PM
ORDER REVISING DEADLINES. ORDER granting38 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/21 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE39 Order. Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Jose E. Martinez. (amb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
38 38 motion Amend/Correct Fri 09/18 4:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Directing Notice to the Class,Second Extension by Carlos Guarisma, Lani Woods, Lori Zaragoza. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 08/27 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott David Owens (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 06/16 10:32 AM
ORDER REVISING DEADLINES. ORDER granting35 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/16 12:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE36 Order. Fairness Hearing set for 12/29/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Jose E. Martinez. (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
35 35 motion Amend/Correct Mon 06/15 5:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Directing Notice to Class by Carlos Guarisma, Lani Woods, Lori Zaragoza. Attorney Keith James Keogh added to party Lani Woods(pty:pla), Attorney Keith James Keogh added to party Lori Zaragoza(pty:pla). Responses due by 6/29/2020(Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 16, 2020
34 34 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 04/16 2:48 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (Vigilante, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/30 3:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alpargatas USA, Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Carlos Guarisma, Lani Woods, Lori Zaragoza.(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
32 32 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/30 2:37 PM
ORDER granting31 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Amend Complaint and Make First Settlement Payment. Plaintiff shall separately docket the amended pleading no later than April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 28, 2020
31 31 misc Stipulation Sat 03/28 2:44 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO MAKE FIRST SETTLEMENT PAYMENT by Carlos Guarisma(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit | Amended Complaint with Exhibits
Thursday, February 27, 2020
30 30 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/27 2:20 PM
ORDER CERTIFYING29 SETTLEMENT CLASS, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, AND DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS. Statement of Claim due by 8/26/2020. Fairness Hearing set for 9/29/2020 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/13 5:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Carlos Guarisma.(Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1. Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Appendix 2. Decl. of Keith J. Keogh,
Att: 3 Appendix 3. Decl. of Scott D. Owens,
Att: 4 Appendix 4. Decl. Of Bret L. Lusskin
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 06/26 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Carlos Guarisma (Lusskin, Bret)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
utility ~Util - Terminate Attorneys Fri 03/01 2:19 PM
Attorney Richard E. Berman terminated. SEE DE27 Notice of Substitution (ail)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
27 27 notice Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel - aty Thu 02/28 2:51 PM
NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Maria Kathleen Vigilante on behalf of Alpargatas USA, Inc. instead of prior counsel of record Richard E. Berman, Esq.. . Attorney Maria Kathleen Vigilante added to party Alpargatas USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Vigilante, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/31 5:06 PM
ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE,granting19 Motion to Stay. Closing Case. Motions Terminated:19 MOTION to Stay filed by Alpargatas USA, Inc.,16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) filed by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
25 25 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 01/25 6:38 PM
RESPONSE in Support re19 MOTION to Stay filed by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 01/25 6:37 PM
RESPONSE in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) filed by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/11 4:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) filed by Carlos Guarisma. Replies due by 1/18/2019. (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Thu 01/03 1:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) ,19 MOTION to Stay . Responses due by 1/11/2019 Replies due by 1/25/2019. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/02 3:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 the parties' Agreed Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Pending Motions. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Strike16 is due on or before January 11, 2019. Defendant's Replies in further support of its Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Strike16 and Motion to Stay19 are due on or before January 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/2/2019. (ean)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/28 11:59 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Stay filed by Carlos Guarisma. Replies due by 1/4/2019. (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/28 10:08 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines and Reset Briefing Schedule re19 MOTION to Stay ,16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) by Carlos Guarisma. Responses due by 1/11/2019(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 14, 2018
19 19 motion Stay Fri 12/14 9:15 PM
MOTION to Stay by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2018(Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/14 9:13 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 12/14 9:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) (DECLARATION OF ENO POLO) filed by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/14 9:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, (PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2)) by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2018(Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
15 15 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Motion Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 12/11 10:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 1/2/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Discovery due by 8/29/2019., Expert Discovery due by 8/29/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2019., Mediation Deadline 11/7/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019., All Pretrial Motions due by 11/22/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/17/2019.), ORDER REFERRING, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 11/7/2019.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 12/03 8:18 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Carlos Guarisma (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/15 9:05 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Ana Tagvoryan Esq. ; granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Harrison M. Brown Esq.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/14 2:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/14/2018. (ean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/13 9:51 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Harrison Brown. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11157092 by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Responses due by 11/27/2018(Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Harrison Brown,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/13 9:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ana Tagvoryan. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-113C-11157083. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Responses due by 11/27/2018(Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Ana Tagvoryan,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/13 9:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alpargatas USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ALPARGATAS S.A., Corporate Parent Alpargatas International S.L. for Alpargatas USA, Inc. (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 11/13 9:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Alpargatas USA, Inc..(Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/13 9:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard E. Berman on behalf of Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Attorney Richard E. Berman added to party Alpargatas USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Berman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/06 3:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlos Guarisma (Lusskin, Bret)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 10/29 2:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Carlos Guarisma. Alpargatas USA, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018.(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, October 22, 2018
4 4 9 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 10/22 4:45 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/22 10:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Alpargatas USA, Inc.. (amb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 10/22 9:55 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Alpargatas USA, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11092369, filed by Carlos Guarisma.(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit A | Visa Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit B | American Express Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit C | Mastercard Agreement