Kapoor v. National Rifle Association of America
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01320 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2019 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Rifle Association of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anish Kapoor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
75 | 75
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Mon 12/17 3:15 PM
Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (klau, ) |
|
74 | 74
order
So Ordered
Mon 12/17 3:04 PM
So Ordered re73 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, with each party to bear his or its own fees, costs, and expenses, filed by National Rifle Association of America. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/17/18. (klau, ) |
|
73 | 73
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/17 11:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) by National Rifle Association of America. (Ramana, Anand) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
72 | 72
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/14 9:31 AM
ORDER that the parties submit a stipulation of dismissal or status update on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/14/18. (klau, ) |