Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence G Berg
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:18-cv-13321
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2018
Terminated:May 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2019 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
University of Michigan
Represented By
Gregory M. Krause
Miller, Canfield, Paddock And Stone PLC
contact info
Brian M. Schwartz
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Lipian
Represented By
Deborah L. Gordon
Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.
contact info
Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor
Deborah Gordon Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
David Daniels
Terminated: 02/21/2019
Represented By
Francyne B. Stacey
Hooper Hathaway, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Andrew Lipian
Terminated: 02/21/2019
Represented By
Deborah L. Gordon
Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.
contact info
Defendant
David Daniels
Terminated: 03/22/2019
Represented By
Francyne B. Stacey
Hooper Hathaway, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 24 2019
ORDER Sustaining in Part Plaintiff's and Non-Parties Objections 141, 142, 143, 146 to the Magistrate Judge's 132 Order. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Nov 27 2019
ORDER granting 181 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Mar 11 2020
OPINION AND ORDER Granting in part Motion for Attorney's Fees and Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Plaintiff's Testimony (ECF Nos.153,195). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
GPO Apr 09 2020
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 178 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 247 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Apr 09 2020
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 178 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 247 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Apr 10 2020
ORDER Adopting 240 Report and Recommendation denying without prejudice 209 MOTION for Sanctions filed by University of Michigan. Order denies 211 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike as moot; grants 255 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by University of Michigan. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 5/12/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Counsel are to forward their phone numbers to mike_lang@mied.uscourts prior to the conference if they want to appear. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO May 15 2020
ORDER sustaining 206 Objection filed by Andrew Lipian to 132 Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford; granting 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and denying 210 Emergency MOTION to Strike. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Jun 19 2020
ORDER denying 261 Motion to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal; denying 262 Motion to Stay; denying 264 Renewed Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
GPO Jan 06 2023
ORDER Establishing Trial Docket for the Period of April 19, 2023 - May 31, 2023. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
GPO Jan 06 2023
TRIAL NOTICE. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg) **PLEASE READ ENTIRE NOTICE BEFORE ATTEMPTING TO CONTACT THE COURT** Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 11, 2023
314 314 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 05/11 3:07 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice and Without Costs or Fees. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
Related: [-]