366 Processing Service Inc v. Mairec Precious Metals US Inc et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Case #: | 7:18-cv-02874 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2019 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mihkail Khaimov
|
|
Defendant
Mairec Edelmetallgesellschaft MBH
|
|
Defendant
Mairec Precious Metals US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
PGM of Texas LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
366 Processing Service Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/10 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 366 Processing Service Inc With Prejudice (Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 01/15 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: Counsel is hereby directed to file a joint status report by April 6, 2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/15/20. (alew, ) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Change of Case Number
Fri 01/10 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from Case Number 7:18-cv-02874-BHH to 7:18-cv-02874-DCC. (abuc) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Fri 01/10 10:12 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Fri 03/01 2:09 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record and Notice of Automatic Stay by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. (Parr, Henry) (Main Document 37 replaced on 3/1/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 3/1/2019 to replace document per attorney request (alew, ). |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/26 9:04 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 34 MOTION for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment and Supporting Memorandum. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/26/2019.(abuc) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/25 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to34 MOTION for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment and Supporting Memorandum by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Parr, Henry) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/19 12:55 PM
Renewed MOTION for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment and Supporting Memorandum by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(alew, ) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 02/15 2:47 PM
Sealed Document. (Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Writ
Fri 02/15 2:36 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Writ of Attachment Prejudgment by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Thu 02/14 3:29 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion to File Sealed Document as to affidavit of Mark Hartig. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/14/19.(alew, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
motion
Seal Document
Wed 02/13 6:37 PM
MOTION to Seal Document Affidavit of Mark Hartig by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Memo in Support | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 02/13 6:28 PM
RESPONSE in Support re4 MOTION Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Response filed by 366 Processing Service Inc.(Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Supporting Documents Declaration of Kurt Rozelsky | ||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/07 3:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Parr, Henry) |
|
26 | 26
7
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 01/07 3:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. (Parr, Henry) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/20 5:03 PM
TEXT-ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 366 International Processing's Opposition to Mairec US's Motion to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 1/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/20/18.(fbos, ) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/20 2:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 MOTION to Intervene. Response to Motion due by 1/7/2019. Entered at the direction of Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/20/18.(sfla) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 12/19 2:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 366 International Processing's Opposition to Mairec US's Motion to Dismiss by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Parr, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/18 12:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to PGM of Texas. LLC Motion to Intervene by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Parr, Henry) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
9
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/17 10:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss (filed by Mairec US) Response filed by 366 Processing Service Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/27/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/06 3:24 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 MOTION to Intervene. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/6/18.(alew, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 12/05 2:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Intervene by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Parr, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/04 11:17 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/4/18.(alew, ) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 12/03 7:48 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Second Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants Motion To Dismiss by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 11/28 11:42 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/28/18.(alew, ) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 11/26 3:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rozelsky, Kurt) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
motion
Intervene
Wed 11/21 3:26 PM
MOTION to Intervene by PGM of Texas LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Floyd, John) |
|
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Motion - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Contract, | ||
Att: 3 20 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Text Messages, | ||
Att: 4 9 pgs Memo in Support Exhibit 2 to the Motion - Memo In Support Of | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 11/13 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Mairec Precious Metals US Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Parr, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Memo in Support | ||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Thu 11/08 8:16 AM
TEXT ORDER preliminarily denying Plaintiff 366 Processing Service Inc.'s ("Plaintiff") 4 Motion for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment, with leave to renew the motion upon development of the record. On October 26, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference in which the Court indicated that Plaintiff's motion for a prejudgment writ of attachment (ECF No. 4 ) was preliminarily denied for lack of a sufficient evidentiary basis upon which to grant the relief requested. However, the Court also stated that Plaintiff may supplement the evidence presented and renew the motion at an appropriate time. Upon renewal of the motion, if any, Defendants Mairec Precious Metals US Inc, Mairec Edelmetallgesellschaft MBH, and Mihkail Khaimov, shall have ten (10) days in which to file a response thereto, whereupon the Court will schedule an evidentiary hearing to consider the matter of a prejudgment writ of attachment more fully. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/8/18. (alew, ) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of Mairec Precious Metals US Inc (Dinkins, Mary) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/01 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Henry L Parr, Jr on behalf of Mairec Precious Metals US Inc (Parr, Henry) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 10/26 3:42 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/26/2018. Court Reporter Debbie Potocki. (hhil, ) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/26 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Telephone Status Conference set for Friday, 10/26/2018, at 01:30 PM in Charleston, before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. The Court will contact counsel at number as provided. (rshu, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/24 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (alew, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/24 12:33 PM
MOTION for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment by 366 Processing Service Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(alew, ) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit of Paul Douglas Meece, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A-Email | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 10/24 12:28 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 366 Processing Service Inc.(alew, ) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/24 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Mihkail Khaimov, Mairec Edelmetallgesellschaft MBH, Mairec Precious Metals US Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8069960.), filed by 366 Processing Service Inc. Service due by 1/22/2019(alew, ) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A-Exclusive Supply Agreement & Term Sheet |