City of Syracuse, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46169 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | New York Northern, 5:18-cv-01184 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:44 PM EST |
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
702 SW 8TH ST.
BENTONVILLE, AR 72716 |
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Albany, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Coram Healthcare Corporation of Greater NewYork
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
#1-10 John Does
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
Toledo, OH 43608
|
|
Defendant
Depomed, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Syracuse, New York
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:16 PM EDT |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4524103) filed by City of Syracuse, New York.(see) [Transferred from nynd on 10/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Summonses Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc..(see) [Transferred from nynd on 10/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons for Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons for Cephalon, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 7 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons for Janssen Pharmaeutica, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Summons for Depomed, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Summons for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons for Endo Generics Holding, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., | ||
Att: 16 Summons for Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 17 Summons for Mallinckrodt, LLC, | ||
Att: 18 Summons for Specgx, LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Summons for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, | ||
Att: 21 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., | ||
Att: 22 Summons for Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 23 Summons for Allergan Finance, LLC, | ||
Att: 24 Summons for Watson Laboratories, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Summons for Actavis, LLC, | ||
Att: 26 Summons for Actavis Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Summons for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., | ||
Att: 28 Summons for AmeriSourceBergen Drug Corporation, | ||
Att: 29 Summons Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 30 Summons for McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 31 Summons for H.D. Smith, LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Summons for Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 33 Summons Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc., | ||
Att: 34 Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., | ||
Att: 35 Summons for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 36 Summons for Walmart, Inc. | ||
3 | 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) [Transferred from nynd on 10/24/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, John Does, and John Doe Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 10/24/2018.] | ||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #60. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from nynd on 10/24/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Northern. Case number 5:18-cv-01184. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |