Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-30690

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:18-ap-01541
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2018
Terminated:Feb 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
City Lumber, Inc.
49-47 31st Street
Long Island City, NY 11101
Represented By
City Lumber, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven P. Kartzman
Mellinger, Sanders & Kartzman, LLC 101 Gibraltar Drive, Ste. 2F
Morris Plains, NJ 07950
Represented By
Steven P. Kartzman
Mellinger, Sanders & Kartzman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Tue 06/04 11:17 AM
Receipt of Fee Amount $ 67.43, Receipt Number 50000977. .. Fee received from Steven Kartzman (dmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 02/04 10:59 AM
Adversary Case (2:18-ap-1541) Closed. (dmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
15 15 court Certification of No Objection Wed 01/09 4:22 PM
Certification of No Objection in re: Settlement of Controversy. Related [+]. The Clerk hereby certifies that no objection to this Notice of Information has been filed. (nds)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: City Lumber shall pay the sum of $5,500 to the Trustee in resolution of the estate's claims. Hearing scheduled for 01/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. Filed by Judah B Loewenstein on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. Objections due by 01/8/2019. filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Kartzman
Friday, January 04, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 01/05 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
court Hearing Held Wed 01/02 2:42 PM
Minute of Pre-Trial Hearing Scheduled on 01/08/19, OUTCOME: A Consent Order Resolving Claim for Turnover of Payments made to City Lumber Inc. During the Pre-Petition Reference Period has been entered at Doc. #11. Related [+] (LucyVelozJimenez)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, December 28, 2018
13 13 misc General Order - Shutdown 2018 Mon 12/31 11:44 AM
GENERAL ORDER INCORPORATING BY REFERENCE STANDING ORDER 18-4 OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY AS APPLIED TO BANKRUPTCY CASES AND ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS. All litigation in a bankruptcy case or adversary proceeding pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey involving as a party the United States of America, its agencies, and/or any other party represented by the Department of Justice or the United States Attorneys Office is immediately suspended, and held in abeyance continuing either (1) until the federal government is funded through congressional appropriation, or (2) for a period of 30 days from the date of the District Court Standing Order 18-4, whichever comes sooner. This Order includes as to the United States, the Department of Justice, or the U.S. Attorneys Office, the suspension of all pending deadlines to file proofs of claim, objections to: discharge, dischargeability, and confirmation of cases under Chapter 11 or Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code for this period. Notice of the entry of this order under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9022 has been given to the following parties in this case: All registered efiling attorneys, self-represented debtors (if this is a bankruptcy case,) or self-represented plaintiffs and defendants (if this is an adversary proceeding.) Please see the Court's website, njb.uscourts.gov for more information as it becomes available.. (jml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/13 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
11 11 order Consent Order Mon 12/10 5:22 PM
CONSENT ORDER RESOLVING CLAIM FOR TURNOVER OF PAYMENTS MADE TO CITY LUMBER, INC.DURING THE PRE-PETITION PREFERENCE PERIOD Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/10/2018 (apc)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Kartzman
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Consent Wed 12/05 5:00 PM
Certificate of Consent. Filed by Judah B Loewenstein on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. (Loewenstein, Judah)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Wed 12/05 4:58 PM
Application re: For a Consent Order Resolving Claim Filed by Judah B Loewenstein on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. Objection deadline is 12/12/2018. (Loewenstein, Judah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Wed 12/05 4:57 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: City Lumber shall pay the sum of $5,500 to the Trustee in resolution of the estate's claims. Hearing scheduled for 01/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. Filed by Judah B Loewenstein on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. Objections due by 01/8/2019. (Loewenstein, Judah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/30 3:24 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr. on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint Filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr. on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. Reason for amendment: Correct Dates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Kartzman
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/30 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr. on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-01541 Complaint by Steven P. Kartzman against City Lumber, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Kartzman
Monday, October 29, 2018
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 4:50 PM
Amended Complaint Filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr. on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. Reason for amendment: Correct Dates. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 26, 2018
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 10/26 2:21 PM
Summons Issued to Steven P. Kartzman for Service on City Lumber, Inc. Answer due on 11/26/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/8/2019 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Fri 10/26 2:17 PM
Hearing Withdrawn Related [+] (dlr)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to Steven P. Kartzman for Service on City Lumber, Inc. Answer due on 11/26/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/9/2019 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)
court Notice of Docketing Error Fri 10/26 2:18 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: INCORRECT DATE USED, filed by THE COURT. Please correct and refile with the court. (dlr)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 25, 2018
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/25 10:08 AM
Summons Issued to Steven P. Kartzman for Service on City Lumber, Inc. Answer due on 11/26/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/9/2019 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Wed 10/24 5:43 PM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Steven P. Kartzman on behalf of Steven P. Kartzman. (Kartzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/24 5:40 PM
Adversary case 18-01541 Complaint by Steven P. Kartzman against City Lumber, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Kartzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A