Monroe County, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46173 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 1:18-cv-00183 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:45 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC
|
|
Defendant
WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
30 HUNTER LN.
CAMP BILL, PA 17011 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Monroe County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:03 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 10/25/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1600320, filed by Monroe County, Mississippi. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 10/25/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to MDL - USDC Northern District of Ohio. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/18. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 10/25/2018.] | |
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Case Transferred to District of Northern Ohio via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 10/25/2018.] | |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-00183. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |