Kush v. Bonabhan
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ortrie D Smith |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00853 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 31, 2021 1:05 PM CDT |
Defendant
Tyler Bonabhan
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Jason Showalter
1007 E. State Route 00
Drexel, MO 64742 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Kush
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 03/20 2:20 PM
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed on 3/20/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/20 11:23 AM
STIPULATION re31 Supplement for Dismisal with Prejuidce by Erica Kush. (Turner, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Supplement
Tue 03/19 4:41 PM
SUPPLEMENT Receipt . (Turner, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/12 12:51 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jason Showalter (Ryan, John) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/21 1:31 PM
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED WRONGFUL DEATH SETTLEMENT, APPORTIONMENT, AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS UNDER SECTION 537.095 OF THE MISSOURI REVISED STATUTES. Signed on 2/21/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/21 11:31 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith: SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING held on 2/21/2019. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kathy Calvert, 816-512-5741. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 02/12 10:07 AM
MOTION for order Joint Motion for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement re25 Notice of Settlement Application for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Tyler Bonabhan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hofer, Scott) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Thu 02/07 4:02 PM
ORDER setting hearing on Plaintiff's application for approval of wrongful death settlement. Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Signed on 2/7/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 01/25 12:49 PM
NOTICE of settlement Application for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement by Erica Kush (Turner, John) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Rules of trial
Fri 12/28 12:21 PM
RULES OF TRIAL - Signed on 12/28/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) |
|
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/28 12:20 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 6/11/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at :00 AM in Courtroom 8C, Kansas City (ODS) before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Signed on 12/28/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 12/27 1:07 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Erica Kush. (Turner, John) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Thu 12/20 1:04 PM
Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Brian Stephens filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Kush.(Turner, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Intervenor Complaint
Tue 12/18 1:49 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to11 Intervenor Complaint on behalf of Tyler Bonabhan.(Hofer, Scott) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Order Staying Case
Thu 12/06 11:25 AM
ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith. The Court grants Defendant's motion to stay under oath discovery against Defendant, but declines the issuance of an indefinite stay. By no later than February 4, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report, informing the Court as to the status of the criminal investigation, the status of other discovery in this matter, and any other matters the parties deem relevant. At that time, the Court will revisit its Scheduling and Trial Order. Signed on 12/6/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 12/06 9:27 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/5/2018 regarding a discovery dispute. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
17 | 17
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/05 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Showalter filed by John P. Ryan, Jr on behalf of Defendant Jason Showalter.(Ryan, John) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Mon 12/03 10:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Defendant Tyler Bonabhan.(Hofer, Scott) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Fri 11/30 11:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Kush.(Turner, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 11/28 9:47 AM
NOTICE to take deposition of Brian Stephens filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Kush.(Turner, John) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 11/28 9:46 AM
NOTICE to take deposition of Tyler Bonabhan filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Kush.(Turner, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Quash
Tue 11/27 2:34 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice10 Defendant's motion for protective order and motion to quash due to failure to comply with the Court's Local Rule 37.1. See also Doc. #3, at 2. Signed on 11/27/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Intervenor Complaint
Tue 11/27 12:40 PM
First Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by John P. Ryan, Jr on behalf of Jason Showalter. Service due by 2/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ryan, John) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Protective Order Quash
Tue 11/27 9:40 AM
MOTION for protective order , MOTION to quash Notice of Deposition and Suggestions in Support filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Tyler Bonabhan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hofer, Scott) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Mon 11/26 1:17 PM
ORDER granting7 Jason Showalter's motion to intervene. Jason Showalter moved to intervene in this matter. Neither Plaintiff nor Defendant opposed Showalter's motion, and the time for doing so has passed. L.R. 7.0. For good cause stated, Showalter's motion is granted. Showalter shall electronically file his complaint by no later than December 3, 2018. Signed on 11/26/2018 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 11/14 3:18 PM
First NOTICE to take deposition of Defendant Tyler Bonabhan filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Kush.(Turner, John) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Intervene
Thu 11/08 10:04 AM
Consent MOTION to intervene as Plaintiff filed by John P. Ryan, Jr on behalf of Jason Showalter. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney John P. Ryan, Jr added to party Jason Showalter(pty:dft))(Ryan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/02 10:46 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Tyler Bonabhan.(Hofer, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 10/31 12:00 PM
NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial by Erica Kush (Turner, John) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/29 3:28 PM
RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 10/29/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) |
|
3 | 3
order
Rule 16 Notice
Mon 10/29 3:25 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 12/13/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/27/2018. Corporate disclosures due by 11/13/2018. Signed on 10/29/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPADMIN
Mon 10/29 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.(Woods, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 10/26 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County, Missouri County, case number 18CA-CC00454, filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Tyler Bonabhan. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6008753.(Hofer, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |