New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00587
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2018
Terminated:Sep 26, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 28, 2018 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTHONY ROMANO (1)
Represented By
CAROL GILLEN
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
KEVIN GERARD WALSH
Gibbons PC
contact info
ANNE M. COLLART
Gibbons PC
contact info
ROBERT A. WEIR, JR.
Weir & Plaza, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MARY ELISSA TOSCANO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info

GPO Aug 17 2020
OPINION FILED as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/17/2020. (js)

Docket last updated: 11/07/2019 7:37 PM EST
Thursday, March 08, 2018
Arrest of ANTHONY ROMANO. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to ANTHONY ROMANO. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT as to ANTHONY ROMANO (1). (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Order to Seal Case as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/8/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk:Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 3/8/2018; deft. advised of rights; financial affidavit executed; Attorney Appointment Hearing as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 3/8/2018; preliminary hearing waived on the record; Bond Hearing as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 3/8/2018, Bond set as to ANTHONY ROMANO (1) $100,000 Appearance Bond secured by property, etc. (CD #ECR.) (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO: CAROL GILLEN for ANTHONY ROMANO appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/8/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY ROMANO (1) $100,000 Appearance Bond secured by property, etc. (Finance notified) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/8/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to ANTHONY ROMANO in amount of $ 100,000 secured by property. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs Agreement to Forfeit Property as to ANTHONY ROMANO dated 3/8/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY ROMANO: Time excluded from 3/8/18 until 5/15/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/8/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ROBERT A. WEIR, JR appearing for ANTHONY ROMANO - Attorney CAROL GILLEN terminated. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
12 12 Letter from Robert A. Weir, Jr., Esq(WEIR, ROBERT) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
13 13 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO re: attendance at event on 3/18/18.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/16/18. (nm, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE THOMAS S. KEARNEY appearing for USA. (KEARNEY, THOMAS) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
15 15 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/6/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
16 16 ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/12/2018. (jqb, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
17 17 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/18/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
18 18 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/1/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY ROMANO : Time excluded from 5/7/2018 until 7/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/7/2018. (gl, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
20 20 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/1/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
21 21 ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO re: temporary modification of bail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/22/18. (nm, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY ROMANO: Time excluded from 7/11/2018 until 9/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/11/2018. (gl, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
23 23 CONSENT ORDER as to ANTHONY ROMANO regarding travel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/16/18. (LM, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY ROMANO: Time excluded from 9/11/2018 until 11/15/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 9/11/2018. (gl, ) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
25 25 ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY ROMANO.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/19/2018. (kd) [2:18-mj-03555-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Minute Entry attached to docket entry 31 filed by the Clerk's office on 9/28/2018 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (js)
Related: [-]
26 26 INFORMATION as to ANTHONY ROMANO (1) count(s) 1. (bf, )
Related: [-]
27 27 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ANTHONY ROMANO (bf, )
Related: [-]
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb:Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 9/28/2018, Plea Agreement Hearing as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 9/28/2018, Plea entered; COURT RESERVED ON ACCEPTING PLEA, ( Sentencing set for 1/4/2019 01:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3D before Judge Renee Marie Bumb.) (Court Reporter Karen Friedlander.) (bf, )
Related: [-]
29 29 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ANTHONY ROMANO. (bf, )
Related: [-]
30 30 PLEA AGREEMENT as to ANTHONY ROMANO (bf, ) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/15/2018) (ar1). (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/15/2018) (ar1).
Related: [-]
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 9/28/2018. Information Filed. Plea Agreement Hearing as to ANTHONY ROMANO held on 9/28/2018. PLEA: GUILTY TO A ONE-COUNT INFORMATION. Sentencing set for 1/4/2019 at 1:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3D before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Ordered bail continued as previously set. (Court Reporter Karen Friedlander) (ar1, )
Related: [-]