Correct RX Pharmacy Svc Inc v. Cornerstone Automation Sys LLC
Original Case: 3:15-cv-03006
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-pcd-11387 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2019 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
CORNERSTONE AUTOMATION SYSTEMS, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CORRECT RX PHARMACY SERVICES, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 19 2019
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [18-11387 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH, Judge: JLD, Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 01/10/2020 [18-11387] |
Docket last updated: 12/20/2019 2:31 AM CST |
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Cornerstone Automation Systems, L.L.C. 18-11387 (NFD) |