Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. v. Cornerstone Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Cornerstone
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01703 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cornerstone Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Cornerstone Mortgage Company
4201 FM 1960 Road W, Suite 230
Houston, TX 77068 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
234
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/11 9:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/10/2018 At 11:04 AM RE: Motion To Approve Motion Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) Of The Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Existing Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/11/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/18/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/11/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/13 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service of the Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/27 11:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1703 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 02/25 3:43 PM
Joint Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 6:25 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 01/23 4:07 PM
Affidavit of Service of Wing Chan filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 01/02 11:53 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Cornerstone Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Cornerstone Mortgage Company , with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 12/28 5:05 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Wed 12/19 4:05 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i)directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al.(Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 12/13 2:40 PM
Order Regarding Motion to Bind signed on 12/13/2018. (White, Greg) |
|
Saturday, December 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Sat 12/08 4:54 PM
Certificate of Service of the Notice Of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets and Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings to the Existing Case Management Order in Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
ans
Statement
Thu 12/06 2:39 PM
Statement OMNIBUS REPLY TO THE OBJECTIONS TO LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC.S MOTION PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO | ||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/27 5:11 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Approve
Mon 11/19 5:57 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN THE NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO and Coordinate | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Thu 11/01 1:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Cornerstone Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Cornerstone Mortgage Company, with Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 10/26 6:28 PM
Adversary case 18-01703 Complaint against Cornerstone Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Cornerstone Mortgage Company (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |