Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. v. Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01710 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.
40 Chelmsford St.
Chelmsford, MA 01824 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/11 9:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/10/2018 At 11:04 AM RE: Motion To Approve Motion Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) Of The Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Existing Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/11/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/18/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/11/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 01/04 3:13 PM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 1/4/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/04 3:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1710 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Tue 05/05 7:59 AM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Errata 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Transcript
Mon 03/09 4:16 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 2:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 4:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/06 10:55 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Opposition
Fri 07/12 3:35 PM
Opposition Plaintiff Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Pro Forma Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Wed 06/12 1:14 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Bruce A. Schoenberg filed by Stephen E. Turman on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Turman, Stephen) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 06/07 2:34 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen E. Turman on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Turman, Stephen) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
ans
Statement
Mon 05/20 4:52 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Statement
Fri 05/17 8:25 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Statement
Wed 05/15 1:04 PM
Statement of Intent Demand for Trial by Jury filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/14 8:16 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendant's Pro Forma Motion to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
16 | 16
answer
None
Tue 05/14 7:37 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Reply
Sun 04/07 9:42 AM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/21 2:29 PM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
ans
Statement
Thu 03/14 5:36 PM
Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-4 of the Amended Case Management Order | ||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 02/22 5:33 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by James William Brody I on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Brody, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 6:32 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 01/23 5:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of Wing Chan filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Wed 12/19 4:23 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i)directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al.(Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/17 5:47 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Bruce A. Schoenberg on behalf of Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Schoenberg, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 12/13 3:16 PM
Order Regarding Motion to Bind signed on 12/13/2018. (White, Greg) |
|
Saturday, December 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Sat 12/08 6:13 PM
Certificate of Service of the Notice Of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets and Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings to the Existing Case Management Order in Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
ans
Statement
Thu 12/06 4:52 PM
Statement OMNIBUS REPLY TO THE OBJECTIONS TO LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC.S MOTION PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO | ||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/28 8:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Approve
Mon 11/19 8:35 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN THE NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO and Coordinate | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Thu 11/01 2:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc, with Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 10/26 7:19 PM
Adversary case 18-01710 Complaint against Merrimack Mortgage Company, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, Adam M. Bialek, William A Maher, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |