Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01746 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.
1010 Northern Blvd., Ste 336
Great Neck, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 04/07 9:08 AM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 4/7/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/07 9:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1746 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
234
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/11 9:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/10/2018 At 11:04 AM RE: Motion To Approve Motion Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) Of The Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Existing Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/11/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/18/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/11/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
6
pgs
answer
Memorandum of Law
Fri 12/17 3:15 PM
Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to General Order #M-452 and this Court's ADR Orders filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Declaration
Tue 11/30 6:01 PM
Declaration in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
32 | 32
21
pgs
answer
Memorandum of Law
Tue 11/30 5:59 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 11/17 4:08 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on LBHIs Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to General Order #M-452 and the Courts ADR Orders filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Wed 11/17 12:29 PM
Letter to the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Wed 11/17 11:22 AM
Motion to Extend Time filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion, Sanctions
Wed 11/10 6:35 PM
Motion for Sanctions for Violation of General Order #M-452 and this Court's ADR Orders filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 11/17/2021, (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to General Order #M-452 and this Court's ADR Orders | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Endorsed Order
Wed 11/03 10:46 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order Granting Request signed on 11/3/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
ans
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/25 2:14 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Mon 10/18 4:02 PM
Letter Filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Wed 10/13 5:34 PM
Letter to the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman re: Request for Permission to File a Motion for Sanctions Filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
23 | 23
answer
None
Wed 10/13 3:24 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Thu 06/03 5:06 PM
Letter Change of Address Filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Tue 05/05 5:53 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Transcript
Mon 03/09 4:24 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Mon 12/23 11:41 AM
Letter Notice of Change of Address Filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 5:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/06 3:29 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Reply
Sun 04/07 12:55 PM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/21 5:09 PM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
ans
Statement
Thu 03/14 7:27 PM
Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-4 of the Amended Case Management Order | ||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 6:56 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 01/23 6:07 PM
Affidavit of Service of Wing Chan filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Wed 12/19 4:23 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i)directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al.(Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Motion, Approve
Fri 12/14 11:25 AM
Order Regarding Motion to Bind signed on 12/13/2018. (White, Greg) |
|
Sunday, December 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Sun 12/09 1:13 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice Of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets and Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings to the Existing Case Management Order in Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
ans
Statement
Thu 12/06 6:12 PM
Statement OMNIBUS REPLY TO THE OBJECTIONS TO LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC.S MOTION PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO | ||
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/05 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
other
Certificate, Service
Thu 11/29 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Thu 11/29 12:56 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Joshua D Levin-Epstein on behalf of Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd.. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Approve
Mon 11/19 10:30 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN THE NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO and Coordinate | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Fri 11/02 3:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd. With Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Saturday, October 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Sat 10/27 3:26 PM
Adversary case 18-01746 Complaint against Wall Street Mortgage Bankers, Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |