Sullivan, Jr. v. Springer Nature America, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-09983 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2019 5:37 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Springer Nature America, Inc.
Terminated: 03/08/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties and their respective counsel that plaintiff Philip Sullivan, Jr. hereby voluntarily dismisses, with prejudice, his complaint against defendant Springer Nature America, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with the parties to bear responsibility for their respective fees and costs. (Springer Nature America, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/8/2019) (jwh) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Springer Nature America, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 02/15 4:19 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Reopen. The parties' deadline to submit an application to reopen (and to submit the settlement agreement, if they wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction over its enforcement) is hereby EXTENDED to March 18, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) |
|
14 | 14
![]() JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reopen addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from C.K. Lee, Esq. dated February 15, 2019. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised (Docket No. 11) that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the same deadline to beso ordered by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/16/2019) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John M. Magliery dated 1/15/2019. Document filed by Springer Nature America, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference in this matter, previously scheduled for January 22, 2019, at 2:45 p.m., is RESCHEDULED for January 29, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. The parties are reminded that they must file on ECF no later than the Thursday prior to the conference, a joint letter, the contents of which is described in the Court's order scheduling the initial pretrial conference, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter. (Initial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/14/2019) (jwh) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/13 11:35 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to January 15, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint until and including January 15, 2019 - Defendant also agreed to waive all defenses arising from invalid service of process, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John M. Magliery dated December 12, 2018. Document filed by Springer Nature America, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines
Fri 11/09 1:44 PM
Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Assignment Deadline, Mediator Expertise Request Deadline (mf) |
||
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Springer Nature America, Inc.. (pne) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled (by separate Order to be entered today) for January 22, 2019, at 2:45 p.m. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/9/2018. Mediator Expertise Request due by 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/30/2018) (ne) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/30/2018) (ne) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 10/30 9:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 10/30 9:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 10/30 9:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Springer Nature America, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Springer Nature America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15827692)Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.) |