Original Case: 3:16-cv-01307

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-35903
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2018
Terminated:Sep 26, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2019 1:30 AM PDT
Counter-defendant
ROBINSON TAIT PS
Represented By
Craig Peterson
ROBINSON TAIT, P.S.
contact info
Counter-defendant
CRAIG PETERSON
Represented By
Craig Peterson
ROBINSON TAIT, P.S.
contact info
Defendant
WEST COAST SERVICING, INC.
Defendant
GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC
Defendant
DOES, Persons or Parties Unknown Claiming Any Right, Title, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Herein
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellant
TERENCE EDWARDS
Represented By
Terence Edwards
contact info
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellant
TERENCE LYNN EDWARDS
Represented By
Terence Lynn Edwards
contact info
Plaintiff-counter-defendant - Appellee
U.S. BANK, N.A., as trustee for Greenpoint Mortgage Funding Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-AR4
Represented By
Lukasz I. Wozniak
Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/28/2019 1:28 AM PDT
Friday, October 26, 2018
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/26/2018. Transcript due 12/24/2018. Appellant Terence Edwards opening brief due 02/04/2019. Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 03/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11061273] (JBS) [Entered: 10/26/2018 09:12 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 16 pgs Pro Se Case Opening Packet