New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jed S Rakoff
Case #: 1:18-cv-08250
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2018
Terminated:Apr 05, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2019 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
CHARLES SHREM
Represented By
Brian Edward Klein
Baker Marquart LLP
contact info
Donald R. Pepperman
Baker Marquart LLP
contact info
Garnishee
Local Bitcoins USA, Inc.
Represented By
John P. Dean
C/o Oster Law Firm
contact info
Garnishee
Bittrex, Inc.
Garnishee
Charles Schwab & CO., Inc.
Miscellaneous
Gemini Trust Company, LLC
Represented By
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Miscellaneous
Cameron Winklevoss
Represented By
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Miscellaneous
Tyler Winklevoss
Represented By
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Miscellaneous
Winklevoss Bitcoin Trust
Represented By
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Miscellaneous
Winklevoss Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
WINKLEVOSS CAPITAL FUND, LLC
Represented By
Anne Decker
Meade Firm
contact info
Tyler Roberts Meade
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Seena Forouzan
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
Sam Ferguson
The Meade Firm P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 10/26/2018
Represented By
Brian Edward Klein
Baker Marquart LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 10/26/2018


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 26, 2019
misc Cashiers Registry Disbursement Fri 04/26 11:10 AM
CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT as per113 Order,, dated 4/18/2019, from Judge Jed S. Rakoff, on 4/25/2019 disbursed to pay Charles Shrem $61,000.00 Check No. 01903474 dated 4/25/2019 (cla)
Related: [-]
misc Cashiers Registry Disbursement Fri 04/26 11:20 AM
CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT as per114 Order dated 4/18/2019, from Judge Jed S. Rakoff, on 4/25/2019 disbursed to pay Winklevoss Capital Fund LLC $10,000.00 Check No. 01903473 dated 4/25/2019 (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
115 115 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/22 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF STIPULATED VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it is hereby stipulated by and among plaintiff Winklevoss Capital Fund, LLC ("WCF") and defendant Charles Shrem ("Shrem"), by and through their respective counsel of record, that the entire civil action be dismissed with prejudice. WCF and Shrem will each bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The case will not be reopened. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (ne)
Related: [-]
114 114 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/22 4:31 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is ORDERED to release and refund WCF's undertaking in the amount of $10,000. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
113 113 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/22 4:27 PM
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT TO DEFENDANT CHARLES SHREM: The Court previously ordered that defendant Charles Shrem ("Shrem") place $61,000.00in an escrow account with the Clerk of the Court, pending judgment in this matter. (Dkt. 57.)Shrem fully complied with that Order by making that deposit into the Court Registry. This civilmatter has now been dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. The Court hereby directs that the$61,000.00 in escrow be returned to defendant Shrem within seven (7) days of the entry of thisOrder. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (rro) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Mon 04/22 4:32 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ne)
Related: [-]