|
GPO
Dec 17 2018
ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
|
|
GPO
Jan 17 2019
ORDER re Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Matters, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/16/19. Amended Complaint due by 1/22/2019, Responses due by 3/15/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
|
|
GPO
Mar 04 2019
ORDER re STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/21/2019, is CONTINUED to 7/9/2019, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties may appear at the scheduling conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2019. (Timken, A)
|
|
GPO
Mar 15 2019
ORDER RE REQUEST TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 15, 2019. (ECF No. 20) (Munoz, I)
|
|
GPO
Mar 25 2019
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADJUST PAGE LIMIT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 25, 2019. 34 (Munoz, I)
|
|
GPO
Jul 03 2019
ORDER Regarding Stipulation Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/19. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
|
|
GPO
Aug 19 2019
ORDER Approving Stipulation Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/19/2019. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Flores, E)
|
|
GPO
Sep 19 2019
a A. McAuliffe.)(Marrujo, C)ORDER APPROVING Stipulation Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/19. ( Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 12/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbar
|
|
GPO
Dec 20 2019
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay 51 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2019. Case Management Deadline: 6/22/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
|
|
GPO
Jan 24 2020
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 24, 25, Motions to Dismiss and ORDERING Supplemental Briefing Re Request for Preliminary Injunction 17, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/2020. Amended Complaint or Notice due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
|
|
GPO
Feb 21 2020
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Good cause appearing, the request for an extension is GRANTED. On or before March 25, 2020, defendants shall file their respective supplemental briefs as ordered by the Court. On or before April 24, 2020, plaintiffs shall file their responsive supplemental brief as ordered by the Court. Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/21/2020. (Apodaca, P)
|
|
GPO
Jan 14 2022
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/13/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
|
|
GPO
Feb 01 2022
ORDER GRANTNG REQUEST TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/31/2022. (Case Management Deadline: 3/4/2022)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
|
GPO
Feb 23 2022
, O)ORDER GRANTING 100 Joint Request to Continue Deadlines and Vacate Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/23/2022. 3/2/2022 status conference is CONTINUED to 5/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 4/28/2022. The Federal Defendants and the State Defendant shall file their response to the complaint on or before 4/1/2022. (Rivera
|
|
GPO
Apr 01 2022
ORDER GRANTING 103 Joint Request for Temporary Stay of Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2022. Proceedings in this case are STAYED until 4/30/2022. The parties shall file a joint status report by 5/5/2022. All pending deadlines and hearings are VACATED. (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
May 09 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/7/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
|
|
GPO
Jun 03 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/03/2022 (Gonzales, V)
|
|
GPO
Jun 30 2022
ORDER re: 109 Joint Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2022. The temporary stay entered on May 9, 2022 (Doc. 106, Doc. 108) is CONTINUED to August 1, 2022. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than August 5, 2022. (Rivera, O)
|
|
GPO
Aug 02 2022
ORDER GRANTING 111; temporary stay is CONTINUED to September 15, 2022; parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than September 22, 2022, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/2/2022. (Filing Deadline: 9/15/2022)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
|
GPO
Sep 15 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/15/2022. The temporary stay entered on June 30, 2022 is CONTINUED to October 17, 2022. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than October 24, 2022. (Marrujo, C)
|
|
GPO
Oct 25 2022
ORDER CONTINUING Temporary Stay of All Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2022. (Marrujo, C)
|
|
GPO
Nov 14 2022
STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/10/2022. (Maldonado, C)
|