Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Kelly KE Mahoney
Case #: 6:18-cv-02081
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2018
Re-opened:Nov 21, 2022
Terminated:Mar 08, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2019 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
TEAM Industrial Services, Inc
a Texas corporation 13131 Dairy Ashford Suite 600
Sugar Land, TX 77478
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
InterCon Construction, Inc
5512 State Rd. 19 & 113
Waunakee, WI 53957
Represented By
William E McCardell
Dewitt Ross & Stevens Sc
contact info
Chase A Horne
Dewitt LLP
contact info
Paul David Burns
Bradley & Riley
contact info

GPO Nov 04 2022
FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT: I find for InterCon on its breach-of-contract claim and award $14,359.01 in damages. I find for TEAM on InterCon's contractual indemnification claim. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/4/2022. (skm)
GPO Mar 08 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Attorney Fees. See text of Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 3/7/2023. (jlh)

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
77 77 order Judgment Wed 03/08 12:53 PM
AMENDED JUDGMENT: Plaintiff InterCon Construction, Inc., is awarded $14,359.01 in damages on its breach-of-contract claim; Postjudgment interest on the breach-of-contract damages ($14,359.01) accruing from 11/4/2022, at an annual rate of 4.56%, compounded annually; $62,850 in attorney's fees; $3,746.13 in prejudgment interest; Postjudgment interest on the attorney's fees and prejudgment interest (totaling $66,596.14) accruing from 3/8/2023 at an annual rate of 5.04%, compounded annually. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2023. (jlh)
Related: [-]
76 76 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 03/08 12:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part74 Motion for Attorney Fees. See text of Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 3/7/2023. (jlh)
Related: [-]