Neosho County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46125 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:1396 - Tort Negligence |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kansas, 2:18-cv-02497 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:47 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 100 Inc
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 108, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 113, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 122, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 132, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 201, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 5, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Neosho County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:01 PM EDT |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4583223.), filed by Board of Commissioners of the County of Neosho County, Kansas.(Smith, Patrick) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Board of Commissioners of the County of Neosho County, Kansas. (Smith, Patrick) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2018.] | |
3 | 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Board of Commissioners of the County of Neosho County, Kansas - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Smith, Patrick) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2018.] | |
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2018.] | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio (MDL 2804). Signed by deputy clerk on 10/4/18. (hw) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2018.] | |
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 2:18-cv-02497. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |