Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 5:18-bk-41421
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2018
Terminated:Nov 07, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
United Material Recovery, LLC
9216 Bond St
Overland Park, KS 66214-1727
Represented By
Colin N. Gotham
Evans & Mullinix, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, November 09, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/09 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/09/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion To Transfer Case
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
8 8 motion Employ Wed 11/07 2:38 PM
Application to Employ Evans & Mullinix, P.A. as Attorneys for Debtor Filed on behalf of Debtor United Material Recovery, LLC, with Certificate of Service.(Gotham, Colin)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Transfer Case Wed 11/07 1:59 PM
Order Granting Motion To Transfer Case Related [+] Signed on 11/7/2018. (tkg)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Transfer Case Wed 11/07 10:36 AM
Motion for Intra-district Transfer of Case To Kansas City, Kansas Filed on behalf of Debtor United Material Recovery, LLC, with Certificate of Service.(Gotham, Colin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/07 10:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jordan M Sickman with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Sickman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/07 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher T. Borniger with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Borniger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 11/07 4:05 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (tkg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
3 3 misc DeBN Request Form Tue 11/06 4:11 PM
DeBN Request Form: Initial Declination Request for the Debtor Filed by Debtor United Material Recovery, LLC. (Gotham, Colin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D)) Tue 11/06 4:10 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor United Material Recovery, LLC Related [+]. (Gotham, Colin)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)
1 1 44 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) Tue 11/06 3:53 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by United Material Recovery, LLC Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 11/13/2018. (Gotham, Colin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Tue 11/06 3:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) 18-41421 [misc,volp11cc] (1717.00). Receipt number 15349084,amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]