Francis v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-03110 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2019 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thankamma Francis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() JUDGMENT(MMP) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2019. (RJE) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re13 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Thankamma Francis. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Thu 03/28 1:03 PM
(Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Pursuant to the letter filed 3/28/1911 , the Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is now canceled. (HAM) |
|
11 | 11
![]() LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thankamma Francis . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/6/2019.(HAM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/14 2:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/14/2018. (JGK) |
|
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6550362 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice - Judge Practice Pointers
Wed 11/07 10:06 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) |
||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 11/06 11:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-3110 (WMW/TNL). (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6479100) filed by Thankamma Francis. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |