Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 6:18-cv-00578
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2018
Terminated:Aug 20, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2019 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
David Gergen
Represented By
Alan Feldman
Steptoe & Johnson - Arizona
contact info
Defendant
Pro Player Health Alliance
Represented By
Alan Feldman
Steptoe & Johnson - Arizona
contact info
Plaintiff
ProjectRose Sports Science Research Center, LLC
Represented By
Patricia L Peden
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 20, 2021
72 72 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 08/20 1:05 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, )
Related: [-]
71 71 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 08/20 12:58 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/20/21. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
70 70 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/19 4:31 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff ProjectRose Sports Science Research Center, LLC's claims against Defendants Pro Player Health Alliance and David Gergen are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants Pro Player Health Alliance and David Gergen's counterclaims against ProjectRose Sports Science Research Center, LLC, Gary Baxter, and Earl Campbell, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees, costs and expenses. All relief not previously granted is DENIED-AS-MOOT. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/19/2021. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
69 69 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/18 11:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gary Baxter, Earl Campbell, ProjectRose Sports Science Research Center, LLC.(Hanor, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order