New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:18-cv-06300
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2018
Terminated:Aug 14, 2019
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2019 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Aaron Nathaniel Solomon
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Stephen Sonnenberg
JAMS Mediation, Arbitration and ADR Services 620 Eighth Avenue NY Times Building 34th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Plaintiff
Robyn Coghlan
25 W. 132nd Street
New York, NY 10037
Represented By
Natalia Mercedes Kapitonova
The Law Offices Of Stewart Lee Karlin PC
contact info
Stewart Lee Karlin
The Law Offices Of Stewart Lee Karlin, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shane Goldstein Smith
Terminated: 03/05/2019
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Aaron Nathaniel Solomon
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peter Katcher
Terminated: 03/05/2019
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Aaron Nathaniel Solomon
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
24 24 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/14 10:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/14 2:13 PM
ORDER: The24 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/14/2019. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See Order Dismissing Case dated 8/14/2019. (Abdallah, Fida)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 06/28 6:17 PM
ORDER: The parties request an extension to file their stipulation of discontinuance and a corresponding adjournment of the July 8, 2019 conference. ECF No. 23. The requests are granted. The parties shall file their stipulation discontinuing the case by August 14, 2019. If the parties fail to file their stipulation discontinuing this action by August 14, 2019, the Court shall hold a conference in this case on August 16, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/28/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
23 23 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Adjourn Conference Thu 06/27 6:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of discontinuance , MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled on July 8, 2019 by National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
order Scheduling Order Fri 05/31 5:59 PM
ORDER: The parties report that they reached a settlement in principle during their Court-annexed mediation. The Court commends the parties' efforts to resolve the case. The parties shall file their stipulation discontinuing the case by June 28, 2019. If the parties fail to file their stipulation discontinuing this action by June 28, 2019, the Court shall hold a conference in this case on July 8, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/31/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Thu 05/30 11:33 AM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 6/13/2019. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
22 22 order Order(Other) Tue 05/21 1:48 PM
ORDER : It is ORDERED that John Rosenberg and Harolyn Isaac be permitted to retain their cell phones for the purpose of the mediation scheduled on May 22, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/21/2019. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 05/21 12:13 PM
Letter Requesting the Court's endorsement of the enclosed Order permitting two of the Defendants' mediation participants to retain their cell phones for the purpose of the mediation that is scheduled for May 22, 2019. by Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 03, 2019
adr Selection of Mediator Fri 05/03 4:59 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Stephen Sonnenberg selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on May 22, 2019 at 10:00am at the EDNY Brooklyn Courthouse in rooms 302S and 402S. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 6/11/2019. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
20 20 16 pgs misc Transcript Mon 04/29 2:33 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 4, 2019, before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter/Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (Hong, Loan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/04 3:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/4/2019 (FTR Log #10:50-11:09.) (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 04/04 3:43 PM
ORDER: The Court held the initial conference in plaintiff's employment discrimination case on April 4, 2019. The parties shall exchange their initial disclosures and documents as discussed on the record. The Court hereby refers the instant action to Court annexed mediation. The parties are directed to contact Robyn Weinstein, the Court's ADR Administrator, at (718) 613-2578. The parties shall conduct the mediation by May 31, 2019 and shall file a joint letter regarding the status of the case by June 7, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/4/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Thu 04/04 3:47 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
19 19 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Mercedes Kapitonova on behalf of Robyn Coghlan (aty to be noticed) (Kapitonova, Natalia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 03/27 5:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
order Scheduling Order Fri 03/22 5:23 PM
ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference in this case on April 4, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by March 27, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be received in writing at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/22/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
17 17 7 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 03/21 3:51 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/11 11:47 AM
ORDER: The Court grants14 the parties' motion for extension of the time for Defendants to answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise move against the complaint by March 21, 2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/11/2019. (Knapp, Cody)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
15 15 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/05 4:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc., filed by Robyn Coghlan. (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/01 2:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation of partial dismissal and setting deadline on March 21, 2019 for a response to the Amended Complaint Plaintiff must file by March 5, 2019 by Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 02/12 8:19 PM
ORDER: In light of13 Plaintiff's letter response, in which she requests an opportunity to amend her pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), the Court denies11 Defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference without prejudice to renew. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint by March 5, 2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/12/2019. (Knapp, Cody)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 02/11 2:31 PM
ORDER: In light of defendants' request for a pre-motion conference, the February 14, 2019 initial conference and is adjourned sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/11/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
13 13 3 pgs misc Letter Fri 02/08 2:52 PM
Letter (Corrected) by Robyn Coghlan (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs misc Letter Fri 02/08 2:40 PM
Letter by Robyn Coghlan (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
11 11 4 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 02/01 7:34 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint, in anticipation of Defendants' motion for dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit A
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/01 8:50 AM
ORDER: The initial conference previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on February 11, 2019 shall now be held on February 14, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The parties shall arrive in Courtroom 11A South promptly at 11:30 a.m. on February 14, 2019. As plaintiff has retained counsel, the parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by February 8, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/1/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/25 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart Lee Karlin on behalf of Robyn Coghlan (aty to be noticed) (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order Fri 12/07 11:28 AM
ORDER: Defendants request a sixty-day extension of time to respond to plaintiff's1 complaint. Defendants'7 request is granted nunc pro tunc . Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by 2/1/2019. The Court shall hold an initial conference in this case on 2/11/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/6/2018. C/mailed. (Defendants' answers due by 2/1/2019; Initial Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/05 3:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc.. (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Dated December 3, 2018,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/05 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Nathaniel Solomon on behalf of Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Solomon, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/05 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Gutstein on behalf of Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
4 4 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/21 4:36 PM
ORDER : The Honorable Pamela K. Chen assigned this case to me for all pretrial purposes. Enclosed is a copy of the "Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom." Plaintiff and defendants, alike, are required to follow these rules. Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this Order and the enclosed rules to defendants along with the summons and complaint. Accordingly, if service is not made upon defendants by 2/19/2019, or if plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by that date, it will be recommended that the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Plaintiff may choose to receive electronic notification of court issued filings in this civil case. If plaintiff is eligible and wishes to receive electronic notification of court issued documents, plaintiff should complete the attached Registration and Consent form and return the form to the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 11/20/2018. C/mailed w/Attachments: # 1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, # 2 Instruction for Pro Se Registration and Consent for Electronic Service of Orders and Notices Issued by the Court in Civil Cases, # 3 Pro Se Registration and Consent Form. (Service upon Defendants due by 2/19/2019.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 11/07 11:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
2 2 3 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 11/07 11:55 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/07 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Shane Goldstein Smith, Peter Katcher, National Center for Hebrew Language Charter School Excellence and Development Inc., filed by Robyn Coghlan. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 11/7/2018 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 11/07 11:56 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653134080 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]