Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:18-cv-01394
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2018
Terminated:Jan 08, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Oct 22, 2020 5:29 PM EDT
Defendant
ECi Macola/MAX, LLC
Represented By
Lydia Reback
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
John Patrick Gilligan
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Steven David Forry
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Algorithm, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Attivo Group, LLC
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Business Computer Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Copious Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DataSpring, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donas Group, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Exceptional Software Solutions LLC
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fannin Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Red Deer Ventures, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Software Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Triangle Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
iPro, Inc.
Represented By
Sean M. Stiff
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
Shawn J Organ
Organ Cole LLP
contact info
David Jerome Twombly
Organ Cole LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2019
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 15 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/8/2019. (plb)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 14, 2019
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 02/14 11:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Settlement Conference held on 2/14/2019. (agm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/13 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2019. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/08 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Telephone Conference held on 2/8/2019. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/07 3:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2019. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for TRO Tue 01/08 2:04 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot15 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/8/2019. (plb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
37 37 motion Dismiss Mon 01/07 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12/20 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Settlement Conference held on 12/20/2018. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
36 36 1 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Thu 12/13 12:47 PM
Order Setting Mediation Conference: Mediation set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Joseph P Kinneary U S Courthouse 85 Marconi Blvd Columbus OH 43215 before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/13/2018. (agm)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 12/13 12:30 PM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for settlement purposes only. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/13/2018. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/11 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] back, Lydia
Monday, December 10, 2018
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/10 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument set for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 12/10 2:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/06 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
31 31 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/03 6:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/26 8:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal Mon 11/26 4:28 PM
ORDER granting24 and26 Motions to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/26/2018. (ew)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion File Document Under Seal Mon 11/26 11:09 AM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/20 5:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC. (Gilligan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Ralyea
24 24 motion File Document Under Seal Tue 11/20 4:42 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal Defendant ECI Macola/MAX, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC. (Gilligan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/20 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Jerome Twombly for Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc. (Twombly, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/14 2:47 PM
ORDER - Regarding Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/14/2018. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal Tue 11/13 3:38 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/13/2018. (cmw)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/13 3:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/09 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/13/2018 at03:00 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/08 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Gilligan for Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC (Gilligan, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
16 16 motion File Document Under Seal Wed 11/07 4:44 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
15 15 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 11/07 4:28 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Triangle Partners, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Donas Group, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Software Solutions, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Red Deer Ventures, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fannin Consulting, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Exceptional Software Solutions LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff DataSpring, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Copious Solutions, LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Business Computer Technologies, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Attivo Group, LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/07 3:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Algorithm, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/07 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ECi Macola/MAX, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6672044), filed by Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Fannin Consulting, Inc., iPro, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Triangle Partners, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Algorithm, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, Software Solutions, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., DataSpring, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet