Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-72126

Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ben T Barry
Case #: 5:18-ap-07066
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2018
Terminated:Sep 18, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eric George Bagwell
206 Spring Creek Road
Lowell, AR 72745
Represented By
Eric George Bagwell
contact info
Defendant
Floorplan Xpress, LLC
Represented By
Floorplan Xpress, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.
South 8th Street
Rogers, AR 72756
Represented By
Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Cherie Weaver
2838 South 8th Street
Rogers, AR 72758
Represented By
Cherie Weaver
contact info
Plaintiff
United Federal Credit Union
P.O. Box 125
St. Joseph, MI 49085
Represented By
Christopher A. McNulty
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Thursday, September 19, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Dismissing With Prejudice Separate Defendants Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. and Cherie Weaver (RE: related document(s) 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union) Entered on 9/17/2019 (Williams, Lisa)
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/18 8:41 AM
Adversary Case 5:18-ap-7066 Closed. (Williams, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
23 23 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 09/17 3:25 PM
Order Dismissing With Prejudice Separate Defendants Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. and Cherie Weaver Related [+] Entered on 9/17/2019 (Williams, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
22 22 1 pgs court Memorandum of Returned Mail Wed 08/28 2:25 PM
Memorandum of Returned Mai Related [+]. (Schacherbauer, Linda)
Related: [-] 20 Order (Generic)
Sunday, August 11, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/11 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Agreed Order between United Federal Credit Union and Eric George Bagwell (RE: related document(s) 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union) Entered on 8/9/2019 (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Friday, August 09, 2019
20 20 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 08/09 10:26 AM
Agreed Order between United Federal Credit Union and Eric George Bagwell Related [+] Entered on 8/9/2019 (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
19 19 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Tue 07/02 9:39 AM
Trial Scheduled For 7/11/2019 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTICE Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union,9 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Cherie Weaver filed by Defendant Cherie Weaver,10 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. filed by Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.,11 Answer to Complaint Filed by Melissa A. McManus on behalf of Defendant Eric George Bagwell filed by Defendant Eric George Bagwell
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/17 2:39 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Separate Defendant Floorplan Express, LLC (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 04/04 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Trial SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union,9 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Cherie Weaver filed by Defendant Cherie Weaver,10 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. filed by Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.,11 Answer to Complaint Filed by Melissa A. McManus on behalf of Defendant Eric George Bagwell filed by Defendant Eric George Bagwell) Trial scheduled for 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Fayetteville Division.
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
16 16 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 04/02 9:33 AM
Trial SCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Fayetteville Division. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 Complaint # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union,9 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Cherie Weaver filed by Defendant Cherie Weaver,10 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. filed by Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.,11 Answer to Complaint Filed by Melissa A. McManus on behalf of Defendant Eric George Bagwell filed by Defendant Eric George Bagwell
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/19 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/19/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Transferring Adversary Proceeding. Judge Richard D. Taylor Added. Involvement of Judge Ben T Barry Terminated. Entered on 12/17/2018 (Jones, Michelle)
Monday, December 17, 2018
14 14 order Recusal Mon 12/17 10:27 AM
Order Transferring Adversary Proceeding. Judge Richard D. Taylor Added. Involvement of Judge Ben T Barry Terminated. Entered on 12/17/2018 (Jones, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 12/13 10:31 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.. (White, Esther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
12 12 1 pgs court Memorandum of Document Deficiency Tue 12/11 10:35 AM
Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Esther M. White Regarding Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] (Jones, Michelle)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. filed by Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc.
Monday, December 10, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 4:42 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Melissa A. McManus on behalf of Defendant Eric George Bagwell (McManus, Melissa)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 3:41 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. (White, Esther)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 3:40 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Cherie Weaver (White, Esther)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 2:52 PM
SEE DOCKET ENTRY #10 Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Buy Wright Auto Sales, Inc. (White, Esther) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Jones, Michelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 2:51 PM
SEE DOCKET ENTRY #9 Answer to Complaint Filed by Esther M. White on behalf of Defendant Cherie Weaver (White, Esther) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Jones, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/28 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service on Buy Wright Auto Sales and Cherie Weaver Related [+] Filed by Christopher A. McNulty on behalf of Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union. (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union
Monday, November 19, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/19 2:05 PM
Certificate of Service on Floorplan Xpress LLC OK Related [+] Filed by Christopher A. McNulty on behalf of Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union. (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/13 10:02 AM
Certificate of Service on Eric George Bagwell Filed by Christopher A. McNulty on behalf of Plaintiff United Federal Credit Union. (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 11/09 10:19 AM
RECEIPT of Complaint(5:18-ap-07066) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. receipt number 6978551, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 11/08 4:45 PM
Summons Issued on Eric George Bagwell Answer Due 12/10/2018; Floorplan Xpress, LLC Answer Due 12/10/2018; Buy Wright Auto Sales Answer Due 12/10/2018; Cherie Weaver Answer Due 12/10/2018 (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp complaint - COURT USE ONLY Thu 11/08 4:45 PM
Adversary case 5:18-ap-07066. Complaint by United Federal Credit Union against Eric George Bagwell, Floorplan Xpress, LLC, Buy Wright Auto Sales, Cherie Weaver. Fee Amount Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (McNulty, Christopher)
Related: [-]