Lustberg v. Unum Group et. al.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-06401 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 08, 2019 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unum Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Lustberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/31 1:06 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case closed. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/30/2019. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/29 3:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wayne Lustberg (Dolan, Meghan) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference Docket Call
Fri 05/31 12:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Settlement Conference held on 5/30/2019. Counsel for all sides present. Case settled, a stipulation of discontinuance is due within 30 days. (FTR Log #2:19.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 04/18 12:52 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The settlement conference is adjourned to 05/30/2019 at 2:00 pm. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/18/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 04/17 4:59 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on behalf of all parties by Wayne Lustberg. (Dolan, Meghan) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 03/07 11:41 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying7 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference is adjourned without. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and propose three alternate dates for the settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/7/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 03/06 5:41 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Wayne Lustberg. (Dolan, Meghan) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear by Telephone
Wed 03/06 5:20 PM
Letter MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Wayne Lustberg. (Dolan, Meghan) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/01 8:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar the 3/5/3019 Settlement Conference is adjourned to 3/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/1/2019. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing Docket Call ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/08 12:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/3/2019. APPEARANCES: Meghan Dolan for plaintiff; Louis DiGiaimo for defendant. Phase I discovery only. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.) (FTR Log #10:57-11:01.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/27 3:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/27/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 11/15 2:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group. (DiGiaimo, Louis) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 11/13 10:13 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 11/13 10:07 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/13 10:12 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure of Interested Parties
Fri 11/09 5:07 PM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Unum Group. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 11/09 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Nassau County, case number 612463/2018. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no, (Bowens, Priscilla) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/9/2018) (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing | ||
Att: 2 (11/9/2018) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 11/09 5:19 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-10926697 (Bowens, Priscilla) |