Concordia Parish v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46213 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:18-cv-00914 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:48 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Concordia Parish
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:43 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1847615.), filed by Concordia Parish.(Irpino, Anthony) [Transferred from lamd on 11/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/8/2018.] | |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (SWE) Modified on 11/6/2018 to replace with correct document (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic letter sent.(SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Certified Conditional Transfer Order | ||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00914. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |