Franklin County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46216 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 5:18-cv-00500 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:48 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Franklin County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:41 PM EDT |
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4698047.), filed by Franklin County. (Coates, Paul) [Transferred from nced on 11/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - No summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from nced on 11/8/2018.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from nced on 11/8/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 11/6/2018.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from nced on 11/8/2018.] | |
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 5:18-cv-00500. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |