California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:12-cv-00634
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2012
Terminated:May 22, 2012
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 8:18 AM PST
Defendant
Roger Alan Burch
Defendant
Sierra Lumber & Fence Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By
Susan Jane Olson
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Ronald Lee Richman
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By
Susan Jane Olson
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Ronald Lee Richman
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By
Susan Jane Olson
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Ronald Lee Richman
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By
Susan Jane Olson
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Ronald Lee Richman
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info

GPO Feb 09 2012
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.