Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01311

Hawaii Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Robert J Faris
Case #: 1:18-ap-90033
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2018
Terminated:Jan 30, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lisa Armenio Reis
5749 Kalanianaole Hwy
Honolulu, HI 96821
Represented By
Lisa Armenio Reis
contact info
Defendant
Paul Kim Reis
5749 Kalanianaole Hwy
Honolulu, HI 96821
Represented By
Paul Kim Reis
contact info
Plaintiff
Theresa Jean Moore
P.O. Box 75217
Honolulu, HI 96836
Represented By
Theresa Jean Moore
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM HST
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/30 7:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:18-ap-90033). (JN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
15 15 court [CerDocTyp] BNC All Purpose Thu 01/17 7:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service Related [+] Notice Date 01/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 court [CerDocTyp] Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment Thu 01/17 7:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment Related [+] Notice Date 01/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
13 13 court Certificate of Service (Virtual) Tue 01/15 9:41 AM
Certificate of Service. I certify that the document Order Dismissing Amended Complaint Without Prejudice was served by first class mail postage prepaid on Teresa Jean Moore, P.O. Box 75217, Honolulu, HI 96836 on the date of this entry. /s/L. Chang. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Related [+] (LL)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/15 9:38 AM
Order Dismissing Amended Complaint Without Prejudice Related [+] Date of Entry: 1/15/2019. (LL)
Related: [-] ument no.7
Friday, January 04, 2019
11 11 answer Response (NEW EVENT - USE FOR ALL RESPONSES) Fri 01/04 3:57 PM
Response to the Order to Show Cause (OSC) Re: The Dismissal of the Adversary Complaint; Declaration in Support of the Response; Proof of Service (w/Proposed Order on the OSC attached). Filed by Plaintiff Teresa Jean Moore. Related [+]. (JN)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint filed by Teresa Jean Moore,7 Order to Show Cause
Thursday, December 27, 2018
10 10 cmp Certficate of Service of Summons Thu 12/27 11:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Copy of Complaint on Shelly Schmitz 12/24/2018 . (LL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 23, 2018
9 9 court [CerDocTyp] BNC All Purpose Sun 12/23 7:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Service Related [+] Notice Date 12/23/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, December 21, 2018
8 8 court Certificate of Service (Virtual) Fri 12/21 11:39 AM
Certificate of Service. I certify that the document Order to Show Cause Why Amended Complaint Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice and Extending Time to Answer was served by first class mail postage prepaid on Teresa Jean Moore, P.O. Box 75217, Honolulu, HI 96836 on the date of this entry. /s/Joni Nakano. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Related [+]. (JN)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/21 11:36 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Amended Complaint Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice and Extending Time to Answer Related [+]. Date of Entry: 12/21/2018. (JN)
Related: [-] document no.4
Monday, December 03, 2018
6 6 cmp Certficate of Service of Summons Mon 12/03 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service of Amended Summons and Copy of Complaint on Pamela McAnally 11/28/2018; Lisa Armenio Reis 11/28/2018; Paul Kim Reis 11/28/2018; Shelly Schmitz 11/28/2018; Jacqueline Smith 11/28/2018; James Welch 11/28/2018. (JN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
5 5 court Summons (AP) Tue 11/27 1:30 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: Pamela McAnally; Lisa Armenio Reis; Paul Kim Reis; Shelly Schmitz; Jacqueline Smith; James Welch. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (JN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/26 2:28 PM
Amended Complaint; Verification; Exhibits 1-13 by Teresa Jean Moore against Lisa Armenio Reis, Paul Kim Reis, Pamela McAnally, James Welch, Jacqueline Smith, Shelly Schmitz Related [+]. (JN). Modified on 11/26/2018 (JN)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
3 3 court Summons (AP) Tue 11/13 9:25 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: Lisa Armenio Reis; Paul Kim Reis. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (LC)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Over-the-Counter) - COURT USE ONLY Tue 11/13 9:23 AM
Complaint by Theresa Jean Moore against Lisa Armenio Reis, Paul Kim Reis; Adv Proc Coversheet. (LC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/13 9:04 AM
Adversary case 18-90033 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Theresa Jean Moore against Lisa Armenio Reis, Paul Kim Reis. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (LC)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other