New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric N Vitaliano
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:18-cv-06443
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2018
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2019 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
John Hanania
22 Eliot Drive
Lake Grove, NY 11755
Represented By
Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Long Island Railroad
contact info
Defendant
Michael Juchem
14 Lewis Road
Pound Ridge, NY 10576
Represented By
Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Long Island Railroad
contact info
Defendant
Long Island Railroad
a/o Metropolitan Transit Authority Jamaica Station Building
Jamaica, NY 11435
Represented By
Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Long Island Railroad
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Natale
46 Imperial Drive
Selden, NY 11784
Represented By
Marc Wietzke
Flynn & Wietzke
contact info
Richard S. Edelman
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, P.C.
contact info
William L Phillips
Brotherhood Of Railroad Signalmen
contact info
Defendant
Charles Tator
54 Peachtree Court
Holtsville, NY 11742
Represented By
Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Long Island Railroad
contact info
Defendant
Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56
Represented By
Richard S. Edelman
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, P.C.
contact info
William L Phillips
Brotherhood Of Railroad Signalmen
contact info
Defendant
James Sokolowski
12 Avenue C
Holbrook, NY 11741
Represented By
Marc Wietzke
Flynn & Wietzke
contact info
Richard S. Edelman
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, P.C.
contact info
William L Phillips
Brotherhood Of Railroad Signalmen
contact info
Plaintiff
Magwin Roache
Represented By
Joseph Christopher Albanese
White Hilferty & Albanese
contact info
Michael P Hilferty
White, Nisar & Hilferty, LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 17 2020
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Roaches NYSHRL and NYCHRL claims are dismissed in their entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, but without prejudice, and with leave to amend, provided Roache can, in good faith, plead facts sufficient to establish any timely claims are not barred by the election-of-remedies doctrine. Furthermore, Roaches Title VII claims are dismissed in their entirety as to all defendants except LIRR. Roaches Title VII claims for retaliation against LIRR are similarly dismissed, and his Title VII claims for discrimination against LIRR are dismissed, except to the extent that they arise out of materially adverse employment actions in the manner discussed in this Memorandum and Order. The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge James Orenstein for continued pretrial management. SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/25/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
47 47 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/16 11:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants, through their undersigned counsel, that, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)( l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. the above-captioned action shall be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, as against defendant LIRR and with no award of attorney's fees, costs or disbursements by the Court to any party. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/16/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
46 46 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/15 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Magwin Roache (Albanese, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 06/15 12:03 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal with Defendants Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, and James Sokolowski by 7/2/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/15/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
45 45 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Mon 05/24 4:32 PM
Order Dismissing Parties: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants, through their undersigned counsel, that pursuant to Rule 41 (a)( l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. the above-captioned action shall be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as against defendant LIRR and with no award of attorney's fees, costs or disbursements by the Court to any party. Party Long Island Railroad terminated. SoOrdered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/24/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
44 44 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/21 12:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Long Island Railroad (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
43 43 1 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Fri 04/23 12:43 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Long Island Railroad. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/23 2:28 PM
ORDER granting43 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conferences 4/29/21 and 8/3/21 previously scheduled before Magistrate Judge Reyes are cancelled. The parties have 45 days to file the stipulation of settlement no later than 6/7/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/23/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
42 42 2 pgs misc Status Report Fri 12/04 10:59 AM
STATUS REPORT by Long Island Railroad (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/04 4:34 PM
ORDER granting re42 Status Report filed by Long Island Railroad. Further extensions will not be granted. REVISED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE: Discovery is extended until 7/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. The parties are directed to use the AT&T toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 and access code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference. The parties shall adhere to the assigned District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano's Individual Rules of Practice before serving the motion for summary judgment. (See document42 for other deadlines). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/4/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) TEXT ADDED on 12/4/2020 (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
41 41 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 11/25 12:08 PM
Letter by Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
order Status Report Order Tue 11/17 1:23 PM
ORDER The plaintiff will file an Amended Complaint by October 15, 2020. Any named defendant will respond by November 4, 2020. The parties will then confer as to the possibility of mediation as well as a discovery plan. By December 4, 2020, the parties will submit a joint status report with a proposal (or, if they cannot agree, competing proposals) for moving the litigation forward, including whether the parties seek a settlement conference or referral to mediation as well as a proposed discovery schedule. The court will schedule further proceedings as appropriate after reviewing the status report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/17/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/10 4:40 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
40 40 15 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/29 3:26 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Long Island Railroad. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
39 39 minutes Status Conference Telephone Conference Wed 10/07 10:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Status Conference held by telephone on 10/7/2020. The plaintiff will file an Amended Complaint by October 15, 2020. Any named defendant will respond by November 4, 2020. The parties will then confer as to the possibility of mediation as well as a discovery plan. By December 4, 2020, the parties will submit a joint status report with a proposal (or, if they cannot agree, competing proposals) for moving the litigation forward, including whether the parties seek a settlement conference or referral to mediation as well as a proposed discovery schedule. The court will schedule further proceedings as appropriate after reviewing the status report. (Orenstein, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
38 38 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/25 1:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by Long Island Railroad. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/25 3:58 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Defendant LIRR shall answer or otherwise respond to the operative pleading by a date to be discussed at the conference scheduled for October 7, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/25/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
37 37 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 09/23 3:01 PM
Consent Motion to Adjourn Telephonic Status Conference Scheduled for September 30, 2020 at 10:30 am by Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski. (Edelman, Richard) Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct event type. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 09/23 7:09 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
order Scheduling Order Mon 09/21 4:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: I will hold a telephone conference on September 30, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. I respectfully direct all counsel to call 1-877-336-1839 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 391-4302. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the court are prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@uscourts.nyed.gov Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/21/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
36 36 25 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 09/18 12:12 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Roaches NYSHRL and NYCHRL claims are dismissed in their entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, but without prejudice, and with leave to amend, provided Roache can, in good faith, plead facts sufficient to establish any timely claims are not barred by the election-of-remedies doctrine. Furthermore, Roaches Title VII claims are dismissed in their entirety as to all defendants except LIRR. Roaches Title VII claims for retaliation against LIRR are similarly dismissed, and his Title VII claims for discrimination against LIRR are dismissed, except to the extent that they arise out of materially adverse employment actions in the manner discussed in this Memorandum and Order. The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge James Orenstein for continued pretrial management. SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/25/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
35 35 33 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Wed 05/01 1:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to LIRR Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
34 34 25 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 05/01 1:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Marilyn Kustoff filed by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
33 33 37 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 05/01 1:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
32 32 31 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 05/01 1:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
31 31 3 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 05/01 11:23 AM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski. (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum in Support of Union Defendants' Motion for Dismissal of Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 13 pgs Memorandum in Opposition to Union Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Plaintiff,
Att: 3 11 pgs Union Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Dismissal of Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 14, 2019
30 30 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/14 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William L Phillips on behalf of Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski (notification declined or already on case) (Phillips, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
29 29 2 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Tue 03/12 3:01 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial) by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 03/12 5:18 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted on consent. The initial conference previously scheduled for March 20, 2019 is adjourned pending the resolution of the motions to dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/12/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/07 10:53 AM
ORDER denying28 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Plaintiff has not responded to the pre-motion conference request. Regardless, upon review of the Union defendants' papers, a pre-motion conference is not required. The briefing schedule proposed at27 is adopted as to both the LIRR and Union defendants' motions to dismiss. The fully-briefed motions shall be filed on ECF by May 1, 2019, in accordance with the Bundling Rule. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 3/7/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
order Order(Other) Thu 02/28 9:56 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file any response to the pre-motion conference request28 by March 6, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/28/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
28 28 4 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 02/27 3:34 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference re6 Amended Complaint for motion to dismiss amended complaint m by Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski. (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
27 27 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 02/25 3:05 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order for Motion by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/25 9:07 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, March 20, 2019, at 3:00 P.M. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than March 18, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/25/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/22 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of James Sokolowski (aty to be noticed) (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/22 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Christopher Natale (aty to be noticed) (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/22 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56 (aty to be noticed) (Edelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Fri 02/22 10:16 AM
ORDER denying19 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Upon review of the moving papers, a pre-motion conference is not required. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed briefing schedule regarding defendants LIRR, Juchem, Tator, and Hanania's motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/22/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
22 22 3 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 02/21 4:50 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Magwin Roache. (Albanese, Joseph)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/21 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Christopher Albanese on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Albanese, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/21 11:24 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney William L. Phillips, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By February 28, 2019, Mr. Phillips shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Phillips shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Phillips shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/21/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/19 4:08 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11212323. by Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski. (Phillips, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Good Standing Certificate,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Movant
Friday, February 15, 2019
order Order(Other) Fri 02/15 9:50 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond to the pre-motion conference request19 by February 21, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/15/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
19 19 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 02/14 9:14 AM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad, Charles Tator. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
18 18 misc Letter Thu 01/31 4:41 PM
Letter and Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski (Wietzke, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/31 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Wietzke on behalf of Christopher Natale (aty to be noticed) (Wietzke, Marc)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/31 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Wietzke on behalf of James Sokolowski (aty to be noticed) (Wietzke, Marc)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 01/31 6:33 PM
ORDER re18 Letter -- The consent order is so ordered. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/31/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
15 15 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 01/15 5:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Christopher Natale. (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
14 14 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/11 2:45 PM
Proposed Summons. Re6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
13 13 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/08 12:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/08 12:34 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted. Defendants Long Island Rail Road and Mr. Michael Juchem shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/8/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
12 12 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 12/21 6:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56. (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/21 10:48 AM
Proposed Summons. Re6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
10 10 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/17 2:33 PM
Proposed Summons. Re6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 12/12 1:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Long Island Railroad, John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski, Charles Tator. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 John Hanania,
Att: 2 2 pgs Michael Juchem,
Att: 3 2 pgs Christopher Natale,
Att: 4 2 pgs James Sokolowski,
Att: 5 Charles Tator
notice Notice(Other) Wed 12/12 1:06 PM
NOTICE re8 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet -- The proposed summons at [8-5] submitted for Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56 will not be issued at this time because that name does not correspond with the amended complaint. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/10 4:08 PM
Proposed Summons. Re6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons
Friday, November 30, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email Fri 11/30 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Email, Firm name, telephone (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
6 6 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/19 2:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Magwin Roache. (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 11/19 8:45 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 11/19 8:43 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/16 11:51 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Fri 11/16 10:58 AM
NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/19 8:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/15 3:10 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Thu 11/15 2:29 PM
NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/13 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT Magwin Roache against Long Island Railroad, Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56, John Hanania, Charles Tator, Michael Juchem, Christopher Natale, Sokolowski filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10930277 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Magwin Roache. (Hilferty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration