Levi Strauss & Co. v. Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-06977 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 15, 2019 2:19 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
Levi Strauss & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Levi Strauss & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 08/06 10:43 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 31 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/05 10:55 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/13 11:33 AM
NOTICE by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. Of Firm Change For Megan O'Neill (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
respoth
Answer to CounterClaim
Tue 04/02 4:35 PM
ANSWER TO28 First Amended COUNTERCLAIM by Levi Strauss & Co.. (Bricker, Ryan) Modified on 4/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Counterclaim
Tue 03/19 4:56 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Levi Strauss & Co.. Filed byYves Saint Laurent America, Inc..(O'Neill, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 03/13 8:18 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 26 Stipulation to Continue (1) Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim from April 4, 2019 to April 18, 2019; and (2) Deadlines to File Defendant's Opposition to, and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/13 8:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Count IV for Declaratory Relief Because It Fails to State a Claim, and to Dismiss or Strike Counts I, II, and III as Redundant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof . Responses due by 3/19/2019. Replies due by 4/2/2019. Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 03/11 4:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue (1) Hearing Date on Plantiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim from April 4, 2019 to April 18, 2019; and (2) Deadlines to File Defendant's Opposition to, and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 03/08 8:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TIME OF MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.22 ) shall commence at 2:00 p.m. on April 4, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/08 8:29 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Count IV for Declaratory Relief Because It Fails to State a Claim, and to Dismiss or Strike Counts I, II, and III as Redundant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof . Motion Hearing reset for 4/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/28 4:40 PM
NOTICE by Levi Strauss & Co. of Agreement to a Mediator (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
17
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 02/27 2:30 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 21 Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information, and/or Trade Secrets. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (2/27/2019) Signed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/26 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Count IV for Declaratory Relief Because It Fails to State a Claim, and to Dismiss or Strike Counts I, II, and III as Redundant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 3/12/2019. Replies due by 3/19/2019.(Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/26 4:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information, and/or Trade Secrets filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/14 3:16 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/14/2019. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 8/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 to 8/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial
Thu 02/14 3:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2019. The parties shall submit a joint letter regarding ADR selection by 2/28/2019. Case deadlines and trial dates are set. The Court will issue Pretrial Order. (Not Reported) Attorney for Plaintiff: Ryan Bricker. Attorneys for Defendant: Jeffrey Lindenbaum; Megan O'Neill. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2019) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 02/07 3:24 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/07 10:39 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/06 4:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc... (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
15 | 15
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 02/06 9:48 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 02/05 7:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kering S.A. for Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 02/05 7:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kering S.A., Other Affiliate Luxury Goods International, Other Affiliate Yves Saint Laurent, S.A.S. for Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. (O'Neill, Megan) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 02/05 7:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM For Declaratory Relief against Levi Strauss & Co. byYves Saint Laurent America, Inc..(O'Neill, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/05 3:31 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice By Attorney Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13066827.) filed by Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 01/25 3:59 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/03 5:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Levi Strauss & Co... (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 12/10 11:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/24/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/07 6:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. on December 7, 2018, filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/20 1:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 11/20 1:48 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 11/19 11:20 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 11/16 5:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Levi Strauss & Co. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 11/16 5:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/16 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, and Dilution (Injunctive Relief Sought); Jury Trial Demand against Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12856616.). Filed byLevi Strauss & Co..(Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |